Goodell v. Columbia County Public Transportation et al
Plaintiff: Bruce Goodell
Defendant: Columbia County Public Transportation, David Ocampo and Columbia County Transportation Authority
Case Number: 2:2020cv00226
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO EXPEDITE AND SETTING HEARING DATE; granting #11 Defendants' Motion to Expedite Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Violation of Due Process Claim and to Decline Supplemental Jurisdiction; granting #13 Defendants' Motion to Expedite Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. #12 , and Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. #14 for 9/10/2020 at 02:30 PM in Spokane Courtroom 755 before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Expedite Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, #11 MOTION to Expedite Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Violation of Due Process Claim and Decline Supplemental Jurisdiction filed by Bruce Goodell. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Biviano, Andrew)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE: DEADLINES. Text entry; no pdf document will issue. The Court has received Defendants Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 12 and the Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, ECF No. 6. The Motions are set for argument on September 10, 2020, at 2:30 p.m. before Chief Judge Stanley Bastian in Spokane Courtroom 755. The Court will set a telephonic scheduling conference, if necessary, after the Motions have been decided. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A. Bastian. This text-only entry constitutes the court order on the matter. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STATEMENT re #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by All Defendants. (Wagley, Andrew)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2020 at 02:30 PM in Spokane Courtroom 755 before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wagley, Andrew)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Expedite Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2020 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wagley, Andrew)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Violation of Due Process Claim and to Decline Supplemental Jurisdiction by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2020 at 02:30 PM in Spokane Courtroom 755 before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wagley, Andrew)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Expedite Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Violation of Due Process Claim and Decline Supplemental Jurisdiction by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2020 in Spokane Courtroom 755 before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wagley, Andrew)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M Wagley on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Andrew M Wagley added to party Columbia County Public Transportation (pty:dft), Attorney Andrew M Wagley added to party Columbia County Transportation Authority (pty:dft), Attorney Andrew M Wagley added to party David Ocampo(pty:dft))(Wagley, Andrew)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald A Van Wert on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Ronald A Van Wert added to party David Ocampo(pty:dft))(Van Wert, Ronald)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DECLARATION by Andrew S. Biviano in Support re #6 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Bruce Goodell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Biviano, Andrew)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STATEMENT OF Material FACTS re #6 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Bruce Goodell. (Biviano, Andrew)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Bruce Goodell. Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2020 at 02:30 PM in Spokane Courtroom 755 before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Biviano, Andrew)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bruce Goodell re David Ocampo. (Biviano, Andrew)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bruce Goodell re Columbia County Transportation Authority. (Biviano, Andrew)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bruce Goodell re Columbia County Public Transportation. (Biviano, Andrew)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Columbia County Public Transportation, Columbia County Transportation Authority and David Ocampo. (Attachments: #1 Summons CCTA, #2 Summons Ocampo)(AN, Courtroom Deputy)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT OF VIOLATION OF DUE PROCESS, DISCRIMINATION, AND RETALIATION, AND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3484185) Jury Demand. Filed by Bruce Goodell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet, #2 Summons COLUMBIA COUNTY PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION, #3 Summons COLUMBIA COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, #4 Summons David OCAMPO)(Biviano, Andrew)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodell v. Columbia County Public Transportation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia County Public Transportation
Represented By: Ronald A Van Wert
Represented By: Andrew M Wagley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Ocampo
Represented By: Ronald A Van Wert
Represented By: Andrew M Wagley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia County Transportation Authority
Represented By: Ronald A Van Wert
Represented By: Andrew M Wagley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Goodell
Represented By: Andrew Sean Biviano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?