Cruz v. Ferry County et al
Plaintiff: John J Cruz
Defendant: Austin Hershaw, Sue Rahr, Todd Belitz, Jake Jensen, Patrick Rainer, Rick Bowen, Amy Rooker, John Everly, Washington State Criminal Justice Training Commission, Ray Maycumber, City of Spokane, Ferry County, Art Dollard and City of Republic
Case Number: 2:2020cv00250
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 16 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by John J Cruz. (Arnold, Nathan)
July 24, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Unavailability of Counsel by John J Cruz (Arnold, Nathan)
July 15, 2020 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:20-cv-00729. Docket sheet received.
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER (Amended) granting Defendants' #4 Joint MOTION to Change Venue. The case shall therefore be transferred to the Eastern District of Washington. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman Per LCR 3(i) this case will be electronically transferred on 7/15/2020. (PM) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/15/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting Defendants' #4 Joint MOTION to Change Venue. The case shall therefore be transferred to the Eastern District of Washington. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman Per LCR 3(i) this case will be electronically transferred on 7/15/2020. (PM) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/15/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY, filed by Defendants Todd Belitz, Rick Bowen, City of Republic, City of Spokane, Art Dollard, John Everly, Ferry County, Austin Hershaw, Jake Jensen, Ray Maycumber, Sue Rahr, Patrick Rainer, Amy Rooker, Washington State Criminal Justice Training Commission, TO RESPONSE to #4 Joint MOTION to Change Venue (McFarland, Michael) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/15/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Nathan J. Arnold filed by Plaintiff John J Cruz re #4 Joint MOTION to Change Venue (Arnold, Nathan) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/15/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff John J Cruz, to #4 Joint MOTION to Change Venue . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arnold, Nathan) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/15/2020.]
May 29, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #8 Answer to Complaint : Amended docket text to additionally identify Rick Bowen as filing party/defendant, per counsel request. (PS) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/15/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by Todd Belitz, City of Spokane, Art Dollard, John Everly, Jake Jensen, Sue Rahr, Washington State Criminal Justice Training Commission, Rick Bowen .(Warring, Carl) Modified on 5/29/2020 (PS). [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/15/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Carl P Warring on behalf of Defendants Todd Belitz, Rick Bowen, City of Spokane, Art Dollard, John Everly, Jake Jensen, Sue Rahr, Washington State Criminal Justice Training Commission. (Warring, Carl) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/15/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 6 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff John J Cruz (Jacobowitz, Emanuel) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/15/2020.]
May 20, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #4 Joint MOTION to Change Venue: edited text to reflect the the Motion was filed on behalf of all Defendants. (ELS) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/15/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Michael E. McFarland, Jr. filed by Defendants Todd Belitz, Rick Bowen, City of Republic, City of Spokane, Art Dollard, John Everly, Ferry County, Austin Hershaw, Jake Jensen, Ray Maycumber, Sue Rahr, Patrick Rainer, Amy Rooker, Washington State Criminal Justice Training Commission re #4 Joint MOTION to Change Venue (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McFarland, Michael) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/15/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 Joint MOTION to Change Venue filed by All Defendants. Noting Date 6/12/2020, (McFarland, Michael) Modified on 5/20/2020 to add text re filing parties(ELS). [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/15/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (CDA) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/15/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (CDA) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/15/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Ferry County, Austin Hershaw, Ray Maycumber, Patrick Rainer, Amy Rooker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(McFarland, Michael) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/15/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 20-2-07720-8 SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6336577), filed by Patrick Rainer, Ray Maycumber, Austin Hershaw, Amy Rooker, Ferry County. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McFarland, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2020: #2 Complaint) (CDA). [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/15/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz v. Ferry County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Hershaw
Represented By: Michael E McFarland, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Rahr
Represented By: Carl Perry Warring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Belitz
Represented By: Carl Perry Warring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jake Jensen
Represented By: Carl Perry Warring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Rainer
Represented By: Michael E McFarland, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Bowen
Represented By: Carl Perry Warring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Rooker
Represented By: Michael E McFarland, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Everly
Represented By: Carl Perry Warring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Criminal Justice Training Commission
Represented By: Carl Perry Warring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Maycumber
Represented By: Michael E McFarland, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Spokane
Represented By: Carl Perry Warring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferry County
Represented By: Michael E McFarland, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Art Dollard
Represented By: Carl Perry Warring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Republic
Represented By: Jerry John Moberg
Represented By: Mary Moberg Rathbone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J Cruz
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Represented By: Allison Rone Foreman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?