DeWillers v. Derbyshire et al
Plaintiff: Shirley L DeWillers
Defendant: Justin L Derbyshire and Red's Equipment Repairs LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00287
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting ECF No. #4 , Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Tracy L. Wright, having applied for pro hac vice status and being found to meet the requirements for pro hac vice membership, is hereby added as counsel for all Defendants. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Tracy L. Wright. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3551695. by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosholt, Andrea)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. by All Defendants.(Rosholt, Andrea)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Shirley L DeWillers. (Kube, Paul)
August 17, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson assigned to case. (LTR, Case Administrator)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $400; Receipt #0980-3534474 Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rosholt, Andrea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeWillers v. Derbyshire et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin L Derbyshire
Represented By: Andrea J Rosholt
Represented By: Tracy L Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red's Equipment Repairs LLC
Represented By: Andrea J Rosholt
Represented By: Tracy L Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley L DeWillers
Represented By: Paul S Kube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?