Puga v. Saul
Plaintiff: Holly Anne Puga
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv00288
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Mary K Dimke
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Michael Durkin on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney Timothy Michael Durkin added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Durkin, Timothy)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER terminating #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court having considered the amended information contained in ECF No. 10 in granting Mr. Chermol leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. 11, no further ruling is necessary at this time. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke. (ASV)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #8 DAVID CHERMOL LEAVE TO PARTICIPATE PRO HAC VICE. Added Attorney David F Chermol for Holly Anne Puga. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke. (TR, Case Administrator)
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 Amended Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice by: Holly Anne Puga. (Kaminski, Matthew) Modified on 8/28/2020 to correct the event used by atty. (VR, Courtroom Deputy).
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: David Chermol. Plaintiffs counsel shall file a supplemental declaration of David Chermol addressing the requirement in Local Civil Rule 83.2(c)(3)(E) as to whether he has any pending disciplinary sanction actions or has ever been subject to any disciplinary sanctions by any bar association. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke. (ASV)
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: David Chermol. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3536010. by Holly Anne Puga. Motion Hearing set for 8/19/2020 Without Oral Argument before Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing)(Kaminski, Matthew)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued to Andrew M Saul. (Attachments: #1 Summons U.S. Attorney General, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney)(LTR, Case Administrator)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Initial Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Consent or Non-Consent Form. Please Note: Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Return of Consent or Non-Consent is due by the Case Management Deadline set for 8/27/2020. (LTR, Case Administrator)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet by Holly Anne Puga. (LTR, Case Administrator)
August 17, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke assigned to case. (LTR, Case Administrator)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (EW, Law Clerk)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Ex Parte MOTION Application for Leave to Appeal Proceed in forma pauperis by HOLLY ANNE PUGA. (Kaminski, Matthew) Modified on 8/17/2020 to correct filing event. (LTR, Case Administrator).
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants IFP Pending Filed by HOLLY ANNE PUGA.(Kaminski, Matthew) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/17/2020 to correct document date) (LTR, Case Administrator).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Puga v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Timothy Michael Durkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Anne Puga
Represented By: Matthew R Kaminski
Represented By: David F Chermol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?