Farris v. Culp et al
Plaintiff: Wendy Farris
Defendant: Christine Clark, Republic Police Department, Ferry County Sheriff and Loren Culp
Case Number: 2:2020cv00290
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE by Wendy Farris re Loren Culp. (Fong, Eric)
September 10, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE by Wendy Farris re Christine Clark. (Fong, Eric)
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE by Wendy Farris re Republic Police Department. (Fong, Eric)
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE by Wendy Farris re Ferry County Sheriff. (Fong, Eric)
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Loren Culp, Republic Police Department Re #8 Notice of Appearance,. Description: Correct party name. (Moberg, Jerry)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Moberg Rathbone on behalf of Loren Culp, Republic Police Department (Attorney Mary Moberg Rathbone added to party Loren Culp(pty:dft), Attorney Mary Moberg Rathbone added to party Republic Police Department(pty:dft))(Rathbone, Mary)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry John Moberg on behalf of Loren Culp, Republic Police Department (Attorney Jerry John Moberg added to party Loren Culp(pty:dft), Attorney Jerry John Moberg added to party Republic Police Department(pty:dft))(Moberg, Jerry) Modified on 9/9/2020 See Amended Notice of Appearance filed at ECF No. #10 (LMR, Case Administrator).
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E McFarland, Jr on behalf of Christine Clark, Ferry County Sheriff (Attorney Michael E McFarland, Jr added to party Christine Clark(pty:dft), Attorney Michael E McFarland, Jr added to party Ferry County Sheriff(pty:dft))(McFarland, Michael)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Loren Culp. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Republic Police Department, #2 Summons Issued as to Christine Clark, #3 Summons Issued as to Ferry County Sheriff)(LMR, Case Administrator)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christine Clark, Loren Culp, Ferry County Sheriff's Department, Republic Police Department ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3536059) Jury Demand. Filed by Wendy Farris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fong, Eric)
August 18, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr assigned to case. (LMR, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farris v. Culp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Farris
Represented By: Eric M Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Clark
Represented By: Michael E McFarland, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Police Department
Represented By: Mary Moberg Rathbone
Represented By: Jerry John Moberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferry County Sheriff
Represented By: Michael E McFarland, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loren Culp
Represented By: Mary Moberg Rathbone
Represented By: Jerry John Moberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?