McDowell v. Haskell et al
Plaintiff: Alan Ray McDowell
Defendant: Larry Haskell, Robert Ferguson, Lead Prosecutor City of Spokane and Justin Bingham
Case Number: 2:2020cv00300
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 17 SUPPLEMENT by Alan Ray McDowell. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Kitchen Managers, #2 [Proposed] Order to Recall)(LMR, Case Administrator)
September 28, 2020 Filing 15 Letter from Alan Ray McDowell to United States District Court dated 9/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application Documents (Duplicate of ECF Nos. 2 and 3 ). Sealed PDF from public docket, #2 [Second] Complaint (Duplicate of ECF No. #12 ), #3 Transmittal Envelope) (LMR, Case Administrator)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO AMEND OR VOLUNTARILY DISMISS AND DENYING #1 MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; Plaintiff may file within 60 days of the date of this order an amended complaint or attached motion to voluntarily dismiss complaint or risk dismissal and a 'strike' under 28 USC 1915(g). Amended Complaint/Voluntary Dismissal Deadline set for 11/20/2020. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint) (SG, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting application to proceed In Forma Pauperis, Directing Institution to calculate, collect, and forward payment; application by plaintiff to proceed IFP is granted; an initial partial filing fee will be calculated and collected by Spokane County Detention Services (agency having custody of plaintiff). cc of Order and Acknowledgment/Authorization sent to agency. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (SG, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
September 8, 2020 Filing 12 [SECOND] COMPLAINT against Justin Bingham, Robert Ferguson, and Larry Haskell (Filing Fee $400, Receipt # IFP Pending) Filed by Alan Ray McDowell. (Note: Complaint appears to be a copy of original Complaint filed at ECF No. #8 , with a small notation added at page 9). (LMR, Case Administrator) Modified on 9/9/2020 to clarify note on Complaint (LMR, Case Administrator).
September 8, 2020 Filing 11 Letter from Alan Ray McDowell to Several Recipients (refer to PDF attached) dated 8/28/2020 re: request for assistance, briefs, and letters from the following contacts and foundations of choice. (LMR, Case Administrator)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 Witness List by Alan Ray McDowell. (LMR, Case Administrator)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against Justin Bingham, Robert Ferguson, Larry Haskell (Filing Fee $400, Receipt # IFP Pending) Filed by Alan Ray McDowell. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Envelope)(LMR, Case Administrator)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 Letter from Alan Ray McDowell to Federal District Court Clerk dated 8/25/2020 re ordering electronic files - please standby. (LMR, Case Administrator)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 DECLARATION by Alan Ray McDowell in Support re #1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Alan Ray McDowell. (LMR, Case Administrator)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT by Alan Ray McDowell in Support re #1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Alan Ray McDowell. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Envelope)(LMR, Case Administrator)
August 21, 2020 Set Deadlines: Pro Se Law Clerk check deadline set. (LMR, Case Administrator)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from Clerk - Advising Prisoner of case number and deficiency. (Attachments: #1 Civil Rights Complaint Form) (LMR, Case Administrator)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 [Construed] MOTION for Injunctive Relief by Alan Ray McDowell. Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 Transmittal Envelope)(LMR, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDowell v. Haskell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Haskell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lead Prosecutor City of Spokane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Ray McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?