Tombari et al v. State of Washington et al
Plaintiff: Troy Bruner and Antonia Tombari
Defendant: Megan Smith, State of Washington, Washington State Department of Corrections, Renee Schuiteman, Jim Riley, Kristopher Smith and Cathi Harris
Case Number: 2:2020cv00336
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JURY TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2021 at 11:00 AM in Spokane Courtroom 755. Jury Trial set for 12/6/2021 at 09:00 AM in Spokane Courtroom 755. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
October 23, 2020 Filing 7 Minute Entry for TELEPHONIC proceedings held before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian : Scheduling Conference held on 10/23/2020. (Reported/Recorded by: None) (JLK, Courtroom Deputy)
October 16, 2020 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT Joint and Discovery Plan by Troy Bruner, Antonia Tombari. (Maurer, Michael)
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Troy Bruner, Antonia Tombari. (Maurer, Michael)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/23/2020 at 10:00 AM in via Teleconference before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. by All Defendants.(Ulrich, Nicholas)
September 18, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Nicholas Ulrich re #1 Notice of Removal, by All Defendants. (Ulrich, Nicholas)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $400; Receipt #0980-3566664 Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ulrich, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tombari et al v. State of Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Smith
Represented By: Nicholas R Ulrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Washington
Represented By: Nicholas R Ulrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Department of Corrections
Represented By: Nicholas R Ulrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Schuiteman
Represented By: Nicholas R Ulrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Riley
Represented By: Nicholas R Ulrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristopher Smith
Represented By: Nicholas R Ulrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathi Harris
Represented By: Nicholas R Ulrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Bruner
Represented By: Michael A Maurer
Represented By: Charles Hausberg
Represented By: Court A Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonia Tombari
Represented By: Michael A Maurer
Represented By: Charles Hausberg
Represented By: Court A Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?