Surina et al v. Glanzer et al
Plaintiff: DMS, AAS, Aaron M Surina and In Propria Persona Aaron M Surina
Defendant: Spokane County Superior Court Justices, Keith Glanzer, Carl Bernard Wilson, Donna Henry, Keith A Glanzer PS and Keith A Glanzer
Case Number: 2:2020cv00345
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING #18 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, DENYING OTHER MOTIONS WITH LEAVE TO RENEW; Plaintiffs' Motion to Take Judicial Notice #15 is DENIED WITH LEAVE TO RENEW; Plaintiffs' Motion to Recognize Minor Plaintiffs as I.P.P. and Dual Nationals Through Final Foreign Decree Issue 2018 #23 is DENIED WITH LEAVE TO RENEW; Plaintiffs' Motion for Order of Witness Defendant Ezra Glanzer Withdraw as Counsel #30 is DENIED WITH LEAVE TO RENEW. Plaintiffs shall PROPERLY SERVE all Defendants under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4, file proof of proper service, or move to dismiss certain Defendants by no later than December 23, 2020. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (CLP, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
November 18, 2020 Filing 32 DECLARATION by Aaron M. Surina in Support re #21 First MOTION to Expedite Motion for preliminary injunction and order of protection for plaintiffs, #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AGAINST SPOKANE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT EN BANC. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service of Nov 18, 2020)(Surina, Aaron)
November 17, 2020 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE as to #21 First MOTION to Expedite Motion for preliminary injunction and order of protection for plaintiffs, #8 MOTION to Obtain ECF Login and Password, #15 MOTION to take Judicial Notice, #22 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, #9 Proof of Service, #23 MOTION to Recognize Minor, #5 Notice (Other), #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction SENT BY EMAIL SUCCESSFULLY, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Surina, Aaron)
November 17, 2020 Filing 30 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (atty EZRA T. GLANZER) by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2020 at 11:00 AM in Spokane Courtroom 755 before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Attachments: #1 EMAIL TO EZRA REGARDING CONVERSATION ABOUT LAWYER-WITNESS RULE)(Surina, Aaron)
November 17, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE RESETTING HEARING ON MOTION - By Court - Text entry; no PDF document. Motion Hearing re #23 MOTION to Recognize Minor is RESET to 12/28/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail. (TNC, Courtroom Deputy)
November 17, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE RESETTING HEARING ON MOTION - By Court - Text entry; no PDF document. Motion hearing re #15 MOTION to take Judicial Notice is RESET to 12/11/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail. (TNC, Courtroom Deputy)
November 16, 2020 Filing 27 DECLARATION by Keith A. Glanzer in Opposition re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Keith Glanzer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Glanzer, Ezra)
November 16, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 11/25/2020 without oral argument filed by Keith Glanzer. (Glanzer, Ezra)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING #22 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (SG, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion to expedite preliminary injunction hearing, ECF No. #21 , is GRANTED. Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction, ECF No. #18 , by no later than November 16, 2020. Plaintiffs shall file any reply by no later than November 18, 2020. The hearing on Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction, ECF No. #18 , is RESET to November 25, 2020 without oral argument. TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF DOCUMENT WILL ISSUE. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (CLP, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
November 12, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Recognize Minor Plaintiffs as IPP and Dual Nationals Through Final Foreign Decree Issued 2018 by Aaron M Surina. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (CLP, Case Administrator)
November 12, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel by Aaron M Surina. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Motion inadvertently attached to the PDF of ECF #21 .)(CLP, Case Administrator) (Main Document 22 file stamped and replaced on 11/19/2020) (CLP, Case Administrator).
November 12, 2020 Filing 21 First MOTION to Expedite Motion for preliminary injunction and order of protection for plaintiffs by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Surina, Aaron) (Main Document 21 replaced on 11/12/2020 to correct rotation of the PDF. Motion for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel, page 1 of this PDF, was inadvertently attached, and is now filed as a separate motion at ECF #22 .) (CLP, Case Administrator).
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff Aaron Surina's Motion to Expedite Preliminary Injunction Order to Protect Plaintiffs, ECF No. #19 . Local Civil Rule 7(i)(2)(C) requires that a motion to expedite (1) demonstrate good cause, (2) states the position of the opposing party, and (3) sets a date of hearing that is not less than seven days after the motion's filing. Plaintiff's motion does not comply with these requirements. Accordingly, Plaintiff's motion to expedite, ECF No. #19 , is DENIED WITH LEAVE TO RENEW. Because Plaintiff is proceeding pro se, this Court will allow Plaintiff to refile the motion. If he chooses to refile, Plaintiff must state (1) why the motion needs to be heard on an expedited basis and (2) the position of Defendants regarding the motion to expedite. TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF DOCUMENT WILL ISSUE. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (CLP, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
November 5, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Expedite Preliminary Injunction Order to Protect Plaintiffs by Aaron M Surina. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (CLP, Case Administrator)
November 5, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Aaron M Surina. Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karmen Colby)(CLP, Case Administrator)
November 5, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION to take Judicial Notice 11/20/2020 without oral argument filed by Keith Glanzer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Final Findings and Divorce Orders from Spokane County Superior Court file no. 17-3-01817-0)(Glanzer, Ezra)
October 27, 2020 Filing 16 Pro se litigant Aaron M Surina has registered to file documents electronically and receive service of documents and notice of electronic filings to the email legal@surina.org via ECF. TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF DOCUMENT WILL ISSUE. (JW, ECF Admin)
October 21, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to take Judicial Notice by Aaron M Surina. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(CLP, Case Administrator)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #8 PRO SE MOTION TO OBTAIN ECF LOGIN AND PASSWORD. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (CLP, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
October 19, 2020 Filing 13 CORRECTED DOCUMENT filed by Keith Glanzer, Carl Bernard Wilson Re #10 Notice of Appearance,. Description: Incorrect e-signature. (Glanzer, Ezra)
October 19, 2020 Filing 12 CORRECTED DOCUMENT filed by Keith Glanzer Re #11 Answer to Complaint. Description: Incorrect e-signature. (Glanzer, Ezra)
October 16, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Keith Glanzer.(Glanzer, Ezra)
October 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ezra Tyrone Glanzer on behalf of Keith Glanzer, Carl Bernard Wilson (Attorney Ezra Tyrone Glanzer added to party Keith Glanzer(pty:dft), Attorney Ezra Tyrone Glanzer added to party Carl Bernard Wilson(pty:dft))(Glanzer, Ezra)
October 16, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE by Aaron M Surina re Keith Glanzer, Donna Henry, Spokane County Superior Court Justices, Carl Bernard Wilson. (CLP, Case Administrator)
October 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Obtain ECF Login and Password by Aaron M Surina. Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (CLP, Case Administrator)
October 16, 2020 Filing Fee Received. Receipt #SPO037508 in the amount of $25.00 from Aaron Surina. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
October 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE in the record by Donna Henry. (CLP, Case Administrator)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND SETTING A PARTIAL FEE. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall pay a filing fee of $25.00 to initiate this action, which sum shall also satisfy any administrative fee. Filing Fee due by 11/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (CLP, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Removal (State Court Civil Action #17-3-01817-0) by Aaron M Surina. (CLP, Case Administrator)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH LEAVE TO RENEW. Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals a lack of information regarding expenses and litigation history. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall proffer the full filing fee, or submit a properly completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Case Management Deadline set for 10/26/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (CLP, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
September 24, 2020 Summons Issued in Paper as to Keith Glanzer, Donna Henry, Spokane County Superior Court Justices, Carl Bernard Wilson. (CLP, Case Administrator)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing Fee $400, Receipt # IFP Pending) Jury Demand. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(CLP, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Surina et al v. Glanzer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron M Surina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: In Propria Persona Aaron M Surina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spokane County Superior Court Justices
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Glanzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Bernard Wilson
Represented By: Ezra Tyrone Glanzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith A Glanzer PS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith A Glanzer
Represented By: Ezra Tyrone Glanzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?