Long Family Trust et al v. Chelan County Public Works et al
Plaintiff: Jeanine Hundley Christensen Long, Kelley McKay Christensen, Harold Abram Christensen, Cathy Ann Christensen Schuyler, The Kenneth Dean Long and Jeanine Hundley Long Family Trust, Cary Brett Christensen, Julie Kay Christensen Schulleri and Jeanine Hundley Long
Defendant: Eric Pierson, Andrew Brunner, Chelan County Public Works and Kevin & Sandra L Bowen Trust
Case Number: 2:2020cv00357
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 42:9607
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING INJUNCTIVE RELIEF WITH LEAVE TO RENEW. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (SG, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Party Kelley McKay Christensen, Julie Kay Christensen Schulleri, Cathy Ann Christensen Schuyler, The Kenneth Dean Long and Jeanine Hundley Long Family Trust, Cary Brett Christensen and Harold Abram Christensen terminated. Filed by Jeanine Hundley Long. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Envelope)(LTR, Case Administrator)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs' Complaint, ECF No. #1 , contains several deficiencies. First, not all Plaintiffs have signed the Complaint. Second, Plaintiffs have not provided a clear statement of the Court's subject-matter jurisdiction. Specifically, they have not shown that all Plaintiffs have different citizenship from all Defendants. See Carden v. Arkoma Assocs., 494 U.S. 185, 187 (1990). Before this Court may hear oral argument on a Temporary Restraining Order, Plaintiffs must correct these deficiencies by filing an Amended Complaint. The Amended Complaint must contain the signature of all Plaintiffs, the citizenship of each Plaintiff and Defendant, and a clear statement of the Court's jurisdiction. If Plaintiffs do not file an Amended Complaint within 30 days of the date of this Order, the Court will dismiss the Complaint. Additionally, once they have filed the Amended Complaint, Plaintiffs must contact the Court to request a date and time for the matter to be set for a hearing with oral argument. TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF DOCUMENT WILL ISSUE. THIS TEXT-ONLY ENTRY CONSTITUTES THE COURT'S ORDER OR NOTICE ON THE MATTER. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (TNC, Courtroom Deputy) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (LTR, Case Administrator)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing Fee $400, Receipt # SPO037432) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 References, #3 Transmittal Memo)(LTR, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long Family Trust et al v. Chelan County Public Works et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanine Hundley Christensen Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelley McKay Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Abram Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Ann Christensen Schuyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Kenneth Dean Long and Jeanine Hundley Long Family Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cary Brett Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Kay Christensen Schulleri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanine Hundley Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Brunner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chelan County Public Works
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin & Sandra L Bowen Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?