Modified Atmosphere Enterprises LLC v. Crunch Pak LLC
Plaintiff: Modified Atmosphere Enterprises LLC
Defendant: Crunch Pak LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00359
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Filing 22 JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL ACTION. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice (ECF No. #20 ), all claims and causes of action in this matter are DISMISSED without prejudice and without costs or fees to any party. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
October 30, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Modified Atmosphere Enterprises LLC (Keeley, Brian)
October 27, 2020 Filing 19 **AMENDED** NOTICE of Appearance Sally W. Harmeling by Sally W Harmeling on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Sally W Harmeling added to party Crunch Pak LLC(pty:dft))(Harmeling, Sally) Modified on 10/27/2020 to reflect amended notice (BF, Paralegal).
October 27, 2020 Filing 18 **AMENDED** NOTICE of Appearance Peter A. Spadoni by Peter Anthony Spadoni on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Peter Anthony Spadoni added to party Crunch Pak LLC(pty:dft))(Spadoni, Peter) Modified on 10/27/2020 to reflect amended notice. (BF, Paralegal).
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Robert R. Brunelli added for Modified Atmosphere Enterprises LLC. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Matthew C. Holohan added for Modified Atmosphere Enterprises LLC. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, Defendant shall file its answer, or otherwise respond, to the complaint no later than 11/11/2020. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal)
October 27, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Robert R Brunelli. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3599629. by Modified Atmosphere Enterprises LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Keeley, Brian)
October 27, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Matthew C Holohan. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3599617. by Modified Atmosphere Enterprises LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Keeley, Brian)
October 26, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by E Russell Tarleton on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney E Russell Tarleton added to party Crunch Pak LLC(pty:dft))(Tarleton, E)
October 26, 2020 Filing 10 Stipulated MOTION to Expedite by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Knutson, Jacob)
October 26, 2020 Filing 9 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 11/25/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Knutson, Jacob)
October 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance Jacob M. Knutson by Jacob M Knutson on behalf of All Defendants (Knutson, Jacob)
October 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance Peter A. Spadoni by Jacob M Knutson on behalf of All Defendants (Knutson, Jacob)
October 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance Sally W. Harmeling by Jacob M Knutson on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Jacob M Knutson added to party Crunch Pak LLC(pty:dft))(Knutson, Jacob)
October 19, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Modified Atmosphere Enterprises LLC re Crunch Pak LLC. (Keeley, Brian)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 Report on the filing or determination of an action involving a patent. (SG, Case Administrator)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Crunch Pak LLC. (SG, Case Administrator)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Modified Atmosphere Enterprises LLC. (Keeley, Brian)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Crunch Pak LLC ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3578495) Jury Demand. Filed by Modified Atmosphere Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A to Complaint)(Keeley, Brian)
October 2, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (SG, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Modified Atmosphere Enterprises LLC v. Crunch Pak LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crunch Pak LLC
Represented By: Peter Anthony Spadoni
Represented By: Sally W Harmeling
Represented By: E Russell Tarleton
Represented By: Jacob M Knutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Modified Atmosphere Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Brian Keith Keeley
Represented By: Robert R Brunelli
Represented By: Matthew C Holohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?