Olsen v. Azar
Plaintiff: Jeremy Olsen
Defendant: Alex M Azar, II
Case Number: 2:2020cv00374
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-cv-03814. Docket sheet received.
October 14, 2020 Filing 15 Case transferred to the USDC for the Eastern District of Washington, pursuant to the Court Order entered 10/9/2020. Sent to Court via Extraction. (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/14/2020.]
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. In accordance with the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the #11 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Venue and to Dismiss Certain Claims is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS MOOT WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The motion is GRANTED to the extent that it seeks to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington. The motion is DENIED AS MOOT WITHOUT PREJUDICE in all other respects. It is further ORDERED that the #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED AS MOOT WITHOUT PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall forthwith TERMINATE all remaining deadlines in this case and TRANSFER the case file to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington. It is further ORDERED that the case on this Court's docket is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 9, 2020. (lcrbw3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/14/2020.]
April 13, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY to opposition to motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by ALEX M. AZAR, II. (Bickford, James) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/14/2020.]
April 6, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE re #11 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by JEREMY OLSEN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld, Jeffrey) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/14/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Rule 12(b)(3) Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order on Rule 12(b)(6) Motion)(Bickford, James). Added MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction on 3/24/2020 (ztth). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/14/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY to opposition to motion re #2 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JEREMY OLSEN. (Blumenfeld, Jeffrey) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/14/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/23/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/23/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/17/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 1/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service)(Blumenfeld, Jeffrey); Modified text on 2/21/2020 (ztth) to correct Date of Service Upon Alex M. Azar, II. [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/14/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 8 Memorandum in opposition to re #2 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALEX M. AZAR, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Order in Zieroth v. Azar)(Bickford, James) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/14/2020.]
February 6, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/10/2020. (hs) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/14/2020.]
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant's #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file his opposition to the plaintiff's motion for summary judgment on or before February 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 6, 2020. (lcrbw3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/14/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 MOTION for Summary Judgment by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bickford, James) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/14/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by James O. Bickford on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II (Bickford, James) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/14/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered the plaintiff's #5 Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Court's rules, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that James C. Pistorino, 224 Lexington Drive, Menlo Park, CA 94025, is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 29, 2020. (lcrbw3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/14/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing fee received Motion for Pro Hac Vice #5 : $ 100.00, receipt number: 4616102182. (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/14/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- James C. Pistorino, Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by JEREMY OLSEN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Blumenfeld, Jeffrey) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/14/2020.]
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/14/2020.]
December 26, 2019 Filing 3 ERRATA Notice of Errata Regarding Complaint by JEREMY OLSEN #1 Complaint, filed by JEREMY OLSEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Corrected Complaint)(Blumenfeld, Jeffrey) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/14/2020.]
December 26, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (adh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/14/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Summary Judgment by JEREMY OLSEN (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Blumenfeld, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld, Jeffrey) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/14/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6672310) filed by JEREMY OLSEN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons (US Dept. of HHS), #3 Summons (USAG), #4 Summons (USAO), #5 Notice of Related Case)(Blumenfeld, Jeffrey) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/14/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olsen v. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Olsen
Represented By: Jeffrey Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M Azar, II
Represented By: James Owen Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?