Almhana et al v. Trestle Creek LLC et al
Plaintiff: Haitham Almhana and A. H.
Defendant: Greystar Management Services LP, Rebekah Gifford, Trestle Creek LLC and Greystar RS West, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00399
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J Stone on behalf of Rebekah Gifford (Attorney Benjamin J Stone added to party Rebekah Gifford(pty:dft))(Stone, Benjamin)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF shall issue) GRANTING Defendant's Stipulated Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record, ECF No. #16 . Michelle P. Myers is terminated as counsel of record for Defendant Trestle Creek, LLC, and Benjamin J. Stone of Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard and Smith LLP remains as counsel of record for all Defendants. This text-only entry constitutes the Courts ruling in this matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant) Modified on 12/17/2020 (MS, Judicial Assistant).
December 16, 2020 Filing 16 Stipulated MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (atty Michelle P Myers) by Trestle Creek LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/15/2021 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Myers, Michelle)
December 15, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Jury Demand. Filed by All Plaintiffs.(Schultz, Jessica)
December 14, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J Stone on behalf of Trestle Creek LLC (Attorney Benjamin J Stone added to party Trestle Creek LLC(pty:dft))(Stone, Benjamin)
December 8, 2020 Filing 12 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Trestle Creek LLC. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Myers, Michelle)
December 8, 2020 Filing 13 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF shall issue) GRANTING the stipulated motion by Plaintiffs and Defendant Trestle Creek, LLC, ECF No. #12 , to extend Trestle Creek's opportunity to file an answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint, ECF No. #1 . Trestle Creek's deadline to serve a responsive pleading is extended to December 17, 2020
December 4, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re Rebekah Gifford. (Schultz, Jessica)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF shall issue) GRANTING the stipulated motion by Plaintiffs and Defendant Greystar Management Services, L.P. (Greystar), ECF No. #9 , to extend Greystar's opportunity to file an answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint, ECF No. #1 . Greystar's deadline to serve a responsive pleading, previously set for November 25, 2020, is extended until December 17, 2020. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on this matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
December 3, 2020 Filing 9 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadlines Re Responsive Pleading by Greystar Management Services LP. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Stone, Benjamin)
November 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J Stone on behalf of Greystar Management Services LP (Attorney Benjamin J Stone added to party Greystar Management Services LP(pty:dft))(Stone, Benjamin)
November 25, 2020 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re Trestle Creek LLC. (Schultz, Jessica)
November 25, 2020 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re Trestle Creek LLC. (Schultz, Jessica)
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re Rebekah Gifford. (Schultz, Jessica)
November 5, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by All Plaintiffs. (Schultz, Jessica)
October 29, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Trestle Creek LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Greystar Management Services LP, #2 Summons Issued as to Rebekah Gifford)(LMR, Case Administrator)
October 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3601854) Jury Demand. Filed by All Plaintiffs.(Schultz, Jessica) #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Incorrect Summons) (SG, Case Administrator). Modified on 10/28/2020 - Attorney to file correct summons to be issued. (SG, Case Administrator).
October 28, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson assigned to case. (SG, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Almhana et al v. Trestle Creek LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greystar Management Services LP
Represented By: Benjamin J Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebekah Gifford
Represented By: Benjamin J Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trestle Creek LLC
Represented By: Benjamin J Stone
Represented By: Michelle P Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greystar RS West, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haitham Almhana
Represented By: Jessica Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. H.
Represented By: Jessica Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?