Puki v. Okanogan County et al
Plaintiff: Michelle L Puki
Defendant: ABC Corporations, CD Cody P Lunn, CD Noah Stewart, MO Miranda Evans, Jane and John Does 1-30, Okanogan County Public Hospital District No 3 doing business as Mid-Valley Hospital, CD Eric Knapp, Kenneth Oguejiofor, CD Rush, Officer Jerod Gavin, Jane Doe Kopp, Officer Vernon Reyes, CD Tapia, Okanogan County, Okanogan Behavioral Healthcare, Jane Doe Oguejiofor, MO Mitzy Green, City of Omak, CD Mike Adams and David Kopp
Case Number: 2:2020cv00411
Filed: November 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Debra M Akhbari on behalf of Jane Doe Oguejiofor, Kenneth Oguejiofor (Attorney Debra M Akhbari added to party Jane Doe Oguejiofor(pty:dft), Attorney Debra M Akhbari added to party Kenneth Oguejiofor(pty:dft))(Akhbari, Debra)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint by City of Omak, Jerod Gavin, Vernon Reyes.(Miller, Thomas)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Miranda Evans, Tapia, Okanogan County, Eric Knapp, Cody P Lunn, Noah Stewart, Mitzy Green, Mike Adams, Rush re Miranda Evans, Tapia, Okanogan County, Eric Knapp, Cody P Lunn, Noah Stewart, Mitzy Green, Mike Adams, Rush. (McMahon, Patrick)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Vernon Reyes. (Leemon, Mark)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Okanogan County Public Hospital District No 3. (Leemon, Mark)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re Kenneth Oguejiofor. (Leemon, Mark)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance for Dr Oguejiofor by David J Corey on behalf of Jane Doe Oguejiofor, Kenneth Oguejiofor (Attorney David J Corey added to party Jane Doe Oguejiofor(pty:dft), Attorney David J Corey added to party Kenneth Oguejiofor(pty:dft))(Corey, David)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick G McMahon on behalf of Mike Adams, Miranda Evans, Mitzy Green, Eric Knapp, Cody P Lunn, Okanogan County, Rush, Noah Stewart, Tapia (Attorney Patrick G McMahon added to party Mike Adams(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick G McMahon added to party Miranda Evans(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick G McMahon added to party Mitzy Green(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick G McMahon added to party Eric Knapp(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick G McMahon added to party Cody P Lunn(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick G McMahon added to party Okanogan County(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick G McMahon added to party Rush(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick G McMahon added to party Noah Stewart(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick G McMahon added to party Tapia(pty:dft))(McMahon, Patrick)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by David James Russell on behalf of David Kopp, Jane Doe Kopp, Okanogan Behavioral Healthcare (Attorney David James Russell added to party David Kopp(pty:dft), Attorney David James Russell added to party Jane Doe Kopp(pty:dft), Attorney David James Russell added to party Okanogan Behavioral Healthcare(pty:dft))(Russell, David)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly Elizabeth Lynch on behalf of David Kopp, Jane Doe Kopp, Okanogan Behavioral Healthcare (Attorney Holly Elizabeth Lynch added to party David Kopp(pty:dft), Attorney Holly Elizabeth Lynch added to party Jane Doe Kopp(pty:dft), Attorney Holly Elizabeth Lynch added to party Okanogan Behavioral Healthcare(pty:dft))(Lynch, Holly)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Jerod Gavin. (Leemon, Mark)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re Okanogan Behavioral Healthcare. (Leemon, Mark)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re Okanogan County. (Leemon, Mark)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re Okanogan County Public Hospital District No 3. (Leemon, Mark)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re City of Omak. (Leemon, Mark)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Kenneth Oguejiofor. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra M Lovell on behalf of Okanogan County Public Hospital District No 3 (Attorney Alexandra M Lovell added to party Okanogan County Public Hospital District No 3(pty:dft))(Lovell, Alexandra)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald A Van Wert on behalf of Okanogan County Public Hospital District No 3 (Attorney Ronald A Van Wert added to party Okanogan County Public Hospital District No 3(pty:dft))(Van Wert, Ronald)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P Miller on behalf of City of Omak, Jerod Gavin, Vernon Reyes (Attorney Thomas P Miller added to party City of Omak(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas P Miller added to party Jerod Gavin(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas P Miller added to party Vernon Reyes(pty:dft))(Miller, Thomas)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3608686) Jury Demand. Filed by Michelle L. Puki. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Leemon, Mark)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr assigned to case. (LMR, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Puki v. Okanogan County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CD Cody P Lunn
Represented By: Patrick G McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CD Noah Stewart
Represented By: Patrick G McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MO Miranda Evans
Represented By: Patrick G McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane and John Does 1-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Okanogan County Public Hospital District No 3 doing business as Mid-Valley Hospital
Represented By: Ronald A Van Wert
Represented By: Alexandra M Lovell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CD Eric Knapp
Represented By: Patrick G McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Oguejiofor
Represented By: David J Corey
Represented By: Debra M Akhbari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CD Rush
Represented By: Patrick G McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Jerod Gavin
Represented By: Thomas P Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Kopp
Represented By: David James Russell
Represented By: Holly Elizabeth Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Vernon Reyes
Represented By: Thomas P Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CD Tapia
Represented By: Patrick G McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Okanogan County
Represented By: Patrick G McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Okanogan Behavioral Healthcare
Represented By: David James Russell
Represented By: Holly Elizabeth Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Oguejiofor
Represented By: David J Corey
Represented By: Debra M Akhbari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MO Mitzy Green
Represented By: Patrick G McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Omak
Represented By: Thomas P Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CD Mike Adams
Represented By: Patrick G McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Kopp
Represented By: David James Russell
Represented By: Holly Elizabeth Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle L Puki
Represented By: Mark Leemon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?