Estate of Chris Rogers v. County of Spokane et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Chris Rogers
Defendant: NaphCare Inc and County of Spokane
Case Number: 2:2020cv00467
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. by County of Spokane.(Yakely, Heather)
January 28, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by NaphCare Inc.(Wick, Ketia)
January 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by John Edward Justice on behalf of County of Spokane (Attorney John Edward Justice added to party County of Spokane(pty:dft))(Justice, John)
January 7, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ketia Berry Wick on behalf of NaphCare Inc (Attorney Ketia Berry Wick added to party NaphCare Inc(pty:dft))(Wick, Ketia)
December 31, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather C Yakely on behalf of County of Spokane (Attorney Heather C Yakely added to party County of Spokane(pty:dft))(Yakely, Heather)
December 22, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to County of Spokane and NaphCare Inc. (LTR, Case Administrator)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402; Receipt # 0980-3650029) Jury Demand. Filed by Steven Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Freebourn, Chad)
December 21, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (LTR, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Chris Rogers v. County of Spokane et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NaphCare Inc
Represented By: Ketia Berry Wick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Spokane
Represented By: John Edward Justice
Represented By: Heather C Yakely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Chris Rogers
Represented By: Chad H Freebourn
Represented By: Joshua Maurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?