Munich RE Syndicate Limited 457 v. Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Munich RE Syndicate Limited 457
Defendant: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv00124
Filed: March 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2021 Filing 8 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Scheduling Conference set for 6/22/2021 at 01:30 PM by Video Conference before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
May 4, 2021 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. (Eaton, Malaika)
May 4, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. and Affirmative Defenses by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company.(Eaton, Malaika)
April 30, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis Campbell Isacke on behalf of Fireman's Fund Insurance Company (Attorney Curtis Campbell Isacke added to party Fireman's Fund Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Isacke, Curtis)
April 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Malaika M. Eaton on behalf of Fireman's Fund Insurance Company (Attorney Malaika M. Eaton added to party Fireman's Fund Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Eaton, Malaika)
April 15, 2021 Filing 3 PROOF OF SERVICE by Munich RE Syndicate Limited 457 re Munich RE Syndicate Limited 457. (Thames, Jonathan)
March 26, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
March 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fireman's Fund Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 402; Receipt # AWAEDC-3756214) Filed by Munich RE Syndicate Limited 457. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Thames, Jonathan)
March 26, 2021 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munich RE Syndicate Limited 457 v. Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Munich RE Syndicate Limited 457
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
Represented By: Curtis Campbell Isacke
Represented By: Malaika M. Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?