McConnachie v. DSHS et al
Plaintiff: Jerry D McConnachie
Defendant: Dr Dodds Simangan, Dr Richard L Dennie, Dr Verne Cressy, DSHS and Dr Greg Bahder
Case Number: 2:2021cv00181
Filed: June 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Mary K Dimke
Referring Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2021 Filing 10 Letter from Jerry McConnachie to Honorable Judge Dimke not dated. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Envelope) (AY, Case Administrator)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The Complaint (ECF No. #1 ) in this matter is hereby REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Dimke for determination of legal sufficiency, in conjunction with Plaintiff's motions for appointment of counsel (ECF Nos. #3 and #5 ), which were previously referred on June 14, 2021. This case shall remain assigned to Judge Mendoza for all other proceedings. TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF DOCUMENT WILL ISSUE. THIS TEXT-ONLY ENTRY CONSTITUTES THE COURT'S ORDER OR NOTICE ON THE MATTER. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (AY, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
June 21, 2021 Filing 8 Letter from Jerry D McConnachie to Honorable Judge Dimke Re ECF #3 Construed Motion to Appoint Counsel and ECF #5 Second Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Envelope) (AY, Case Administrator)
June 17, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Returned [second page of document not included in return] by Jerry D McConnachie. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Envelope)(AY, Case Administrator)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's motions for appointment of counsel, ECF Nos. #3 & #5 , are hereby REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Dimke for a determination of whether pro se Plaintiff qualifies for court appointed counsel. If thereafter Magistrate Judge Dimke determines Plaintiff so qualifies, she shall appoint counsel for Plaintiff. TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF DOCUMENT WILL ISSUE. THIS TEXT-ONLY ENTRY CONSTITUTES THE COURT'S ORDER OR NOTICE ON THE MATTER. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (AY, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
June 10, 2021 Filing 5 [Second] MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jerry D McConnachie. Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2021 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Envelope)(AY, Case Administrator)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. The District Court Executive shall set a case management review for 30 days, and immediately notify the assigned judicial officer, who will review the Complaint for legal sufficiency. IT IS SO ORDERED. - Text entry;no PDF document. Case Management Deadline set for 7/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (EW, Law Clerk) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
June 2, 2021 Filing 3 (Construed) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jerry D McConnachie. Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2021 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (CLP, Case Administrator)
June 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing Fee $402, Receipt # IFP Pending) Jury Demand. Filed by Jerry D McConnachie. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment to Complaint, #3 Envelope)(CLP, Case Administrator)
June 2, 2021 Summons Issued as to DSHS (summons issued in paper for this defendant only). (CLP, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McConnachie v. DSHS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Dodds Simangan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Richard L Dennie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Verne Cressy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DSHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Greg Bahder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry D McConnachie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?