Guideone Mutual Insurance Company v. Broad-Ocean Technologies LLC et al
Plaintiff: Guideone Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Broad-Ocean Technologies LLC, Goodman Manufacturing Company LP and Does 1 through 25
Case Number: 2:2021cv00209
Filed: July 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 JURY TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: The Video Scheduling Conference set for September 16, 2021, is CANCELLED. Video Status Conference set for 11/30/2022 at 09:30 AM via Video Conference. Pretrial Conference set for 2/21/2023 at 09:30 AM via Video Conference. Jury Trial set for 3/6/2023 at 09:00 AM in Spokane Courtroom 901. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (SG, Case Administrator)
September 10, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: GEOFFREY A. KRAEMER. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-3870367. by Guideone Mutual Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2021 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Silver, Marnie)
September 10, 2021 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Guideone Mutual Insurance Company. (Silver, Marnie)
September 9, 2021 Filing 13 Joint Certificate Pursuant to Rule 26 / Rule 16 and Discovery Plan by Goodman Manufacturing Company LP. (Symmes, William)
August 25, 2021 Filing 12 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Goodman Manufacturing Company LP. (Archer, Maximillian)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting ECF No. #6 , Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Judy S. Okenfuss, having applied for pro hac vice status and being found to meet the requirements for pro hac vice membership, is hereby added as counsel for Defendant Goodman Manufacturing Company, LP. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
August 13, 2021 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Goodman Manufacturing Company LP. (Archer, Maximillian)
August 13, 2021 Filing 9 Goodman Manufacturing Company LP's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Goodman Manufacturing Company LP.(Archer, Maximillian)
August 13, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION by William Symmes in Support re #6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Judy Okenfuss. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-3851693. filed by Goodman Manufacturing Company LP. (Symmes, William)
August 13, 2021 Filing 7 DECLARATION by Judy Okenfuss in Support re #6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Judy Okenfuss. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-3851693. filed by Goodman Manufacturing Company LP. (Symmes, William)
August 13, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Judy Okenfuss. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-3851693. by Goodman Manufacturing Company LP. Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2021 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Symmes, William)
July 28, 2021 Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 9/16/2021 at 11:30 AM in Spokane Courtroom 901 via Video Conference before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (PL, Courtroom Deputy)
July 28, 2021 Filing 4 State Court Documents received filed by Broad-Ocean Technologies LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Records)(Reynolds, Rachel)
July 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Maximillian K Archer on behalf of Goodman Manufacturing Company LP (Attorney Maximillian K Archer added to party Goodman Manufacturing Company LP(pty:dft))(Archer, Maximillian)
July 16, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance and Consent to Removal by William M Symmes on behalf of Goodman Manufacturing Company LP (Symmes, William)
July 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $402; Receipt #AWAEDC-3831690 Filed by Broad-Ocean Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reynolds, Rachel)
July 16, 2021 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson assigned to case. (SG, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guideone Mutual Insurance Company v. Broad-Ocean Technologies LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guideone Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Marnie H Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broad-Ocean Technologies LLC
Represented By: Rachel Tallon Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodman Manufacturing Company LP
Represented By: William M Symmes
Represented By: Maximillian K Archer
Represented By: Judith Okenfuss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?