Pau-Taylor v. Kaluza et al
Plaintiff: Shanna Pau-Taylor
Defendant: Scott A Kaluza and Farmers Elevator of Kensington MN Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv00222
Filed: July 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Compliance With Scheduling Order by Shanna Pau-Taylor (Herman, Lloyd)
September 9, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Compliance With Scheduling Order by Shanna Pau-Taylor (Herman, Lloyd) Modified on 9/13/2021 - Document no longer available, contains personal identifier. Attorney will file corrected document (AY, Case Administrator).
September 9, 2021 Filing 13 Joint Certificate Pursuant to Rule 26 / Rule 16 by Plaintiffs and by All Defendants. (Zener, Jeremy)
September 9, 2021 Filing 12 CORRECTED DOCUMENT filed by All Defendants Re #8 Notice of Compliance With Scheduling Order,. Description: Redacted Minor's Name. (Riseborough, John)
September 9, 2021 Filing 11 CORRECTED DOCUMENT filed by All Defendants Re #10 Notice of Appearance,. Description: Redacting Minor's Name. (Zener, Jeremy)
September 9, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy M Zener on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Jeremy M Zener added to party Farmers Elevator of Kensington MN Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy M Zener added to party Scott A Kaluza(pty:dft))(Zener, Jeremy) Modified on 9/9/2021 - Document no longer available, contains personal identifier. Attorney will file corrected document (AY, Case Administrator). Modified on 9/10/2021 See Corrected Document at ECF #11 (AY, Case Administrator).
September 9, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Jeremy M. Zener by John Charles Riseborough on behalf of All Defendants (Riseborough, John) Modified on 9/9/2021 - Incorrect attorney login used. Jeremy M Zener notified and directed to file Notice of Appearance (AY, Case Administrator). Modified on 9/9/2021 - Document no longer available, contains personal identifier. Attorney will file corrected document (AY, Case Administrator).
September 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Compliance With Scheduling Order by All Defendants (Riseborough, John) Modified on 9/9/2021 - Document no longer available, contains personal identifier. Attorney will file corrected document (AY, Case Administrator). Modified on 9/10/2021 - See Corrected Document at ECF #12 (AY, Case Administrator).
August 11, 2021 Filing 7 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2021 at 08:50 AM via Teleconference before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Attachments: #1 Consent to MJ Form)(TNC, Courtroom Deputy)
August 11, 2021 Filing 6 CORRECTED DOCUMENT filed by All Defendants Re #3 Notice of Appearance,. Description: Redaction of Minor Name in Pleading. (Riseborough, John)
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 CORRECTED DOCUMENT filed by All Defendants Re #4 Amended Answer to Complaint,. Description: Redaction of Minor Name in Pleading. (Riseborough, John)
August 11, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED ANSWER to Answer ECF 1-4 with jury demand. by All Defendants. (Riseborough, John) Modified on 8/11/2021: Caption contains minor name. Directed to file a corrected version with minor name redacted or initials (LMR, Case Administrator). Modified on 8/11/2021: See Corrected document filed at ECF No. #5 (LMR, Case Administrator).
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John Charles Riseborough on behalf of Scott A Kaluza (Riseborough, John) Modified on 8/11/2021: Caption contains minor name. Directed to file a corrected version with minor name redacted or initials (LMR, Case Administrator). Modified on 8/11/2021: See Corrected Document filed at ECF No. #6 (LMR, Case Administrator).
July 26, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by All Defendants. (Riseborough, John)
July 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Fee $402.00 Receipt Number AWAEDC-3838924. Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons and Complaint, #3 Affidavit Affidavit, #4 Verification of State Pleadings)(Riseborough, John) Modified on 7/26/2021 to add receipt number (AY, Case Administrator).
July 26, 2021 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pau-Taylor v. Kaluza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanna Pau-Taylor
Represented By: Lloyd Allen Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott A Kaluza
Represented By: John Charles Riseborough
Represented By: Jeremy M Zener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Elevator of Kensington MN Inc
Represented By: John Charles Riseborough
Represented By: Jeremy M Zener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?