The Estate of Ethan Austin Murray et al v. Spokane County et al
Plaintiff: The Estate of Ethan Austin Murray, Justine L Murray and Mark Jentsch
Defendant: Spokane County and Joseph M Wallace
Case Number: 2:2021cv00227
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2021 Filing 11 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/20/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spokane Courtroom 901 via Video Conference before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (PL, Courtroom Deputy)
August 24, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. by All Defendants.(Browning, Christopher) Modified on 8/25/2021 - Incorrect attorney login used. Attorney notified for further reference to use correct login credentials (AY, Case Administrator).
August 20, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Unavailability of Counsel by All Defendants (Browning, Christopher)
August 12, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Joseph M Wallace. (Langer, Frederick)
August 11, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Spokane County. (Langer, Frederick)
August 10, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Christopher C Browning on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Christopher C Browning added to party Spokane County(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher C Browning added to party Joseph M Wallace(pty:dft))(Browning, Christopher)
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul L Kirkpatrick on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Paul L Kirkpatrick added to party Spokane County(pty:dft), Attorney Paul L Kirkpatrick added to party Joseph M Wallace(pty:dft))(Kirkpatrick, Paul)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting ECF No. #3 , Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Kevin O'Connor, having applied for pro hac vice status and being found to meet the requirements for pro hac vice membership, is hereby added as counsel for Plaintiffs. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
July 29, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Kevin O'Connor. Filing fee $200, receipt number 02042G by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2021 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Fred P. Langer, #2 Affidavit Kevin O'Connor)(Langer, Frederick)
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Spokane County, Joseph M Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Summons Joseph M Wallace)(LTR, Case Administrator)
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Damages for Violations of Civil Rights (42 USC 1983) and for the State Tort of Negligence against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402; Receipt # AWAEDC-3841929) Jury Demand. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Langer, Frederick)
July 29, 2021 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson assigned to case. (LTR, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Estate of Ethan Austin Murray et al v. Spokane County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Ethan Austin Murray
Represented By: Frederick P Langer
Represented By: Braden Pence
Represented By: Kevin O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justine L Murray
Represented By: Frederick P Langer
Represented By: Braden Pence
Represented By: Kevin O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Jentsch
Represented By: Frederick P Langer
Represented By: Braden Pence
Represented By: Kevin O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spokane County
Represented By: Paul L Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Christopher C Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M Wallace
Represented By: Paul L Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Christopher C Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?