Goodin v. Ressa et al
Plaintiff: Elliott DroShun Goodin
Defendant: Michelle L Ressa and Lisa Lydon
Case Number: 2:2021cv00270
Filed: September 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Plaintiff may file a Second Complaint within sixty (60) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
September 30, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.) Case Management Deadline set for 11/30/2021. (BF, Paralegal)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. The District Court Executive shall set a case management review for 30 days, and immediately notify the assigned judicial officer, who will review the Complaint for legal sufficiency. IT IS SO ORDERED. Case Management Deadline set for 10/13/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (SG, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
September 10, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (CLP, Case Administrator)
September 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing Fee $402, Receipt # IFP Pending) Jury Demand. Filed by Elliott DroShun Goodin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Envelope, #3 Summons, #4 Transmittal Letter and State Court Record)(CLP, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodin v. Ressa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elliott DroShun Goodin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle L Ressa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Lydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?