Eslick v. State of Washington et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Eslick
Defendant: State of Washington, Jason P Aebischer, Grant County, Anna Gigliotti, City of Moses Lake, Travis Ruffin and Jose Perez
Case Number: 2:2021cv00282
Filed: September 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying #26 Motion for Reconsideration re: #17 Ex Parte Order on Motion for Pro Bono Counsel filed by Patrick Lee Eslick. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal)
November 18, 2021 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Deny Motion to Dismiss filed by Patrick Lee Eslick. (Eslick, Patrick)
November 15, 2021 Filing 26 First MOTION for Reconsideration re #15 Supplement, #17 Ex Parte Order on Motion for Pro Bono Counsel Respectfully re-motion on ortder #17 by Patrick Lee Eslick. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2021 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Eslick, Patrick)
November 15, 2021 Filing 25 First AMENDED COMPLAINT of Federal violations and misconduct against All Defendants. Jury Demand. Filed by Patrick Lee Eslick.(Eslick, Patrick)
November 1, 2021 Filing 24 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Anna Gigliotti, Grant County. (Miller, Thomas)
November 1, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Katherine A McNulty on behalf of Jason P Aebischer, State of Washington (Attorney Katherine A McNulty added to party Jason P Aebischer(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine A McNulty added to party State of Washington(pty:dft))(McNulty, Katherine)
October 28, 2021 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Deny Motion to Dismiss filed by Patrick Lee Eslick. (Eslick, Patrick)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Striking #19 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal)
October 25, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Anna Gigliotti, Grant County. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2021 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Thomas)
October 25, 2021 Filing 19 First MOTION for Entry of Default as to failure to answer by Patrick Lee Eslick. (Attachments: #1 Supplement process service return, #2 Supplement process service return, #3 Supplement process service return, #4 Supplement process service return)(Eslick, Patrick)
October 20, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. by Jason P Aebischer, State of Washington.(Warring, Carl)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #14 Motion for Pro Bono Counsel. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal)
October 19, 2021 Filing 16 City Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. by City of Moses Lake, Jose Perez, Travis Ruffin.(Ehlis, Kirk)
October 8, 2021 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENT re #14 MOTION for Pro Bono Counsel list of contacted Laywers by Patrick Lee Eslick. (Eslick, Patrick)
October 7, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Bono Counsel by Patrick Lee Eslick. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2021 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Eslick, Patrick)
October 7, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Perry Warring on behalf of Jason P Aebischer, State of Washington (Attorney Carl Perry Warring added to party Jason P Aebischer(pty:dft), Attorney Carl Perry Warring added to party State of Washington(pty:dft))(Warring, Carl)
October 6, 2021 Filing 12 Pro se litigant Patrick Lee Eslick has registered to file documents and to receive service of documents and notice of electronic filings to his email pteslickcase@gmail.com via ECF. TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF DOCUMENT WILL ISSUE. (JW, ECF Admin)
October 1, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirk A Ehlis on behalf of City of Moses Lake, Jose Perez, Travis Ruffin (Attorney Kirk A Ehlis added to party City of Moses Lake(pty:dft), Attorney Kirk A Ehlis added to party Jose Perez(pty:dft), Attorney Kirk A Ehlis added to party Travis Ruffin(pty:dft))(Ehlis, Kirk)
September 29, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONSES Returned Executed by Patrick Eslick re All Defendants. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
September 29, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart A Cassel on behalf of Anna Gigliotti, Grant County (Attorney Stuart A Cassel added to party Anna Gigliotti(pty:dft), Attorney Stuart A Cassel added to party Grant County(pty:dft))(Cassel, Stuart)
September 29, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P Miller on behalf of Anna Gigliotti, Grant County (Attorney Thomas P Miller added to party Anna Gigliotti(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas P Miller added to party Grant County(pty:dft))(Miller, Thomas)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Obtain Electronic Case Filing Authorization. Plaintiff is directed to contact the U.S. District Court Clerk's Office at (509) 458-3400 to obtain an Electronic Case Filing (ECF) login and password and complete any necessary paperwork. By his request and participation in the ECF system, Plaintiff consents to receive notice and service electronically and waives his right to receive notice and service by first class mail pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(E). Waiver of service and notice by first class mail applies to notice of the entry of an order and judgment as well. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. The District Court Executive shall set a case management review for 30 days, and immediately notify the assigned judicial officer, who will review the Complaint for legal sufficiency. IT IS SO ORDERED. - Text entry;no PDF document. Case Management Deadline set for 10/27/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (EW, Law Clerk) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
September 24, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Obtain Electronic Case Filing Authorization by Patrick Eslick. Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2021 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (CLP, Case Administrator)
September 24, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing of Non-Scannable Exhibits with the Clerk. The following non-scannable exhibits have been filed with the Clerk: Exhibits 1-10 re #1 Complaint by Patrick Eslick; (1) USB Thumb Drive. Plaintiff was advised in person that he needs to bring a Judge's copy of the same thumb drive. The original has been verified by IT and will be retained in the Clerks Office for now. (CLP, Case Administrator)
September 24, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Aebischer, #2 Summons Gigilotti, #3 Summons Grant County, #4 Summons Perez, #5 Summons Ruffin)(CLP, Case Administrator)
September 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing Fee $402, Receipt # IFP Pending) Jury Demand. Filed by Patrick Eslick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(CLP, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eslick v. State of Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Eslick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason P Aebischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Gigliotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Moses Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Ruffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?