Hodge v. Kijakazi et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Mckinley Hodge
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2021cv00287
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Lonny R Suko
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Filing 10 Administrative Record by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Langkamer, Joseph)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING #7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AS MOOT. Signed by Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (LTR, Case Administrator)
November 28, 2021 Payment for Civil Case ( Filing fee $ 402; Receipt # AWAEDC-3928199).. (Deissner, Dustin)
November 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph John Langkamer on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Attorney Joseph John Langkamer added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Langkamer, Joseph)
November 10, 2021 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi IFP Pending Filed by Kevin Mckinley Hodge. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit ALJ decision, # 3 Exhibit Appeals Council Decision, # 4 Summons Proposed Summons)(Deissner, Dustin). Objections to R&R due by 11/24/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge James A. Goeke. (LTR, Case Administrator)
November 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M Donovan on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Attorney Brian M Donovan added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Donovan, Brian)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH LEAVE TO RENEW. Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals a lack of information regarding household income and expenses. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall proffer the full filing fee, or submit a properly completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Case Management Deadline set for 11/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (LTR, Case Administrator)
October 5, 2021 Filing 4 CORRECTED DOCUMENT filed by Kevin Mckinley Hodge Re #1 Complaint,. Description: Main complaint document not flattened. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit ALJ decision, #3 Exhibit Appeals Council Decision, #4 Summons Proposed Summons)(Deissner, Dustin)
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi; Reg. Chf. Couns., Reg. X; and U.S. Attorney. (LTR, Case Administrator)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 *** Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Kevin Mckinley Hodge. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deissner, Dustin) Modified on 10/5/2021: to clarify docket/filing event (LTR, Case Administrator).
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi IFP Pending Filed by Kevin Mckinley Hodge. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit ALJ decision, #3 Exhibit Appeals Council Decision, #4 Summons Proposed Summons)(Deissner, Dustin) Modified on 10/5/2021: Main document sealed as it it not flattened, attorney notified -- See Amended/Corrected document filed at ECF No. #4 (LTR, Case Administrator).
October 5, 2021 Notice of Judge Assignment. Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko assigned to case. (LTR, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hodge v. Kijakazi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Mckinley Hodge
Represented By: Dustin Douglas Deissner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Brian M Donovan
Represented By: Joseph John Langkamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?