Glanden v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Brian Glanden
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2021cv00292
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy Zaragoza on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Attorney Nancy Zaragoza added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Zaragoza, Nancy)
November 17, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Glanden re Kilolo Kijakazi. (Hatfield, Chad)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M Donovan on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Attorney Brian M Donovan added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Donovan, Brian)
October 22, 2021 Filing Fee Received. Receipt #26TNVJGB in the amount of $402.00 from Chad Hatfield. (LMR, Case Administrator)
October 12, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFICIENT FILING re #1 Complaint. Filing Fee due by 10/22/2021. (AY, Case Administrator)
October 12, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued to General Counsel Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Summons US Attorney, #2 Summons US Attorney General) as to Kilolo Kijakazi.(AY, Case Administrator)
October 8, 2021 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi IFP Pending Filed by Brian Glanden. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Hatfield, Chad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glanden v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Glanden
Represented By: Chad L Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Nancy Zaragoza
Represented By: Brian M Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?