Hamm v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Shannon Marie Hamm
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2021cv00333
Filed: November 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy Zaragoza on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Attorney Nancy Zaragoza added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Zaragoza, Nancy)
December 21, 2021 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE by Shannon Marie Hamm re Kilolo Kijakazi. (Tree, D)
December 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M Donovan on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Attorney Brian M Donovan added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Donovan, Brian)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge James A. Goeke. (KP, Law Clerk)
November 29, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(TR, Case Administrator)
November 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi IFP Pending Filed by Shannon Marie Hamm. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Tree, D)
November 29, 2021 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (TR, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamm v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Marie Hamm
Represented By: D James Tree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Brian M Donovan
Represented By: Nancy Zaragoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?