Runions v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Robert E Runions
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2021cv00340
Filed: December 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Edward F Shea
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M Donovan on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Attorney Brian M Donovan added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Donovan, Brian)
January 25, 2022 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE by Robert E Runions re Kilolo Kijakazi. (Yanich, Eitan)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge James A. Goeke. (KP, Law Clerk)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH LEAVE TO RENEW - Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals it is incomplete as Plaintiff failed to provide pertinent information. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall proffer the full filing fee, or submit a properly completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Case Management Deadline set for 1/10/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge James A. Goeke. (LMR, Case Administrator)
December 10, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security. (LMR, Case Administrator)
December 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security IFP Pending Filed by Robert E Runions. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Yanich, Eitan). Modified on 12/10/2021: To remove IFP application filed at ECF No. 2 from main document in this docket entry.
December 10, 2021 Notice of Judge Assignment. Senior Judge Edward F. Shea assigned to case. (LMR, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Runions v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E Runions
Represented By: Eitan Kassel Yanich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Brian M Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?