Jones et al v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Plaintiff: James R Jones and Dayna Jones
Defendant: DePuy Orthopaedics Inc and Medical Device Business Services Inc
Case Number: 2:2022cv00003
Filed: January 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Mary K Dimke
Referring Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL on behalf of Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Medical Device Business Services Inc. Attorney Suzanne K. Pierce is withdrawing. Samuel Kidder Anderson is substituted as counsel for Defendants. (Attorney Samuel Kidder Anderson added to party DePuy Orthopaedics Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Kidder Anderson added to party Medical Device Business Services Inc(pty:dft))(Anderson, Samuel)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: Before the Court is the parties' stipulated motion to extend the deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs' complaint, ECF No. #2 . Finding good cause, the Court GRANTS the motion. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' complaint by no later than March 14, 2022. TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF DOCUMENT WILL ISSUE. THIS TEXT-ONLY ENTRY CONSTITUTES THE COURT'S ORDER OR NOTICE ON THE MATTER. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (TR, Case Administrator)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge Mary K. Dimke no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. TEXT ORDER ONLY. NO PDF ATTACHED. (RG, Chief Deputy)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Mary K. Dimke. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
January 13, 2022 Filing 2 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Medical Device Business Services Inc. Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2022 Without Oral Argument before Judge Mary K. Dimke. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED Order to Extend Time for Respond to Complaint)(Pierce, Suzanne)
January 6, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $402; Receipt #AWAEDC-3952764 Filed by Medical Device Business Services Inc, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Defendants' Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Pierce, Suzanne)
January 6, 2022 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Mary K. Dimke assigned to case. (TR, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R Jones
Represented By: Troy Y Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dayna Jones
Represented By: Troy Y Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Orthopaedics Inc
Represented By: Suzanne Karen Pierce
Represented By: Samuel Kidder Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Device Business Services Inc
Represented By: Suzanne Karen Pierce
Represented By: Samuel Kidder Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?