Krill v. Life Flight Network, LLC
Plaintiff: John Krill
Defendant: Life Flight Network, LLC and John Doe Employees I-V of Life Flight Network LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00057
Filed: April 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 BENCH TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: A Pretrial Conference is set for 8/31/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spokane Courtroom 902 before Judge Thomas O. Rice. A Bench Trial is set for 9/11/2023 at 9:00 AM in Spokane Courtroom 902 before Judge Thomas O. Rice. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal)
May 25, 2022 Filing 8 Minute Entry for TELEPHONIC proceedings held before Judge Thomas O. Rice: Scheduling Conference held on 5/25/2022. (Reported by: Crystal Hicks) (BF, Paralegal)
May 11, 2022 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT and Discovery Plan - Joint by John Krill. (Bond, Dwight)
April 21, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Dwight Howard Bond on behalf of John Krill (Attorney Dwight Howard Bond added to party John Krill(pty:pla))(Bond, Dwight)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 5/25/2022 at 8:30 AM before Judge Thomas O. Rice. Counsel shall file a Joint Status Report no later than 5/11/2022. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal)
April 11, 2022 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Life Flight Network, LLC. (Lockwood, William)
April 11, 2022 Filing 3 Life Flight Network's ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. by Life Flight Network, LLC.(Lockwood, William) Modified on 4/12/2022 to remove jury demand language (LTR, Case Administrator).
April 5, 2022 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (LTR, Case Administrator)
April 4, 2022 Filing 2 DECLARATION of W. Gregory Lockwood In Support of Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal by Life Flight Network, LLC. (Lockwood, William)
April 4, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $402; Receipt #AWAEDC-4006397 Filed by Life Flight Network, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit Service)(Lockwood, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krill v. Life Flight Network, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Krill
Represented By: Sara Maleki
Represented By: Dwight Howard Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Flight Network, LLC
Represented By: William Gregory Lockwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Employees I-V of Life Flight Network LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?