Phat N Sticky LLC v. Top Shelf Led Inc
Plaintiff: phat n sticky, llc and Phat N Sticky LLC
Defendant: top shelf led inc. and Top Shelf Led Inc
Case Number: 2:2022cv00071
Filed: April 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; DENYING #11 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS. Motion Hearing Re #5 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is STRICKEN. Amended Complaint Deadline set for 6/30/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (AY, Case Administrator)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING #6 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (AY, Case Administrator)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion - By Court - Text entry; no PDF document. Oral Argument Requested re #6 MOTION to Remand , #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : The Court will be in trial the week of 6/13/2022 and not available for the hearing on 6/13/2022. The Court RESETS the Motion Hearing from 6/13/2022 to 6/24/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. The Court will provide video instructions by email one week prior to the hearing.(MF, Courtroom Deputy)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Top Shelf Led Inc. (Wojcik, Matthew)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Top Shelf Led Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wojcik, Matthew)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Phat N Sticky LLC. Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2022 at 09:30 AM in Spokane Courtroom 755 before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Saade, Gabriel) Modified on 6/9/2022 to convert event type to motion (AY, Case Administrator).
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion - By Court - Text entry;no PDF document. Oral Argument Requested re #6 MOTION to Remand , #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . The Motion Hearing on 6/13/2022 will be held by Video Conference. Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2022 at 09:30 AM by Video Conference before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. The Court will provide an email to counsel prior to the hearing with the video call in information. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING #7 MOTION TO EXPEDITE; RESETTING HEARING DATE. Motion Hearing Re #5 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is RESET from without oral argument to 6/13/2022 at 09:30 AM Spokane Courtroom 755. At the hearing, the Court will hear oral argument on both Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #6 . Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (AY, Case Administrator)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Top Shelf Led Inc. (Wojcik, Matthew)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Phat N Sticky LLC. Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2022 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Saade, Gabriel)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Remand by Phat N Sticky LLC. Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2022 at 09:30 AM in Spokane Courtroom 755 before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Gabriel S. Saade in support of Motion to Remand)(Saade, Gabriel)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Top Shelf Led Inc. Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2022 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wojcik, Matthew)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT by Thomas C. Stratton Filing of All Records in State Court Proceeding re #1 Notice of Removal, by Top Shelf Led Inc. (Wojcik, Matthew)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by top shelf led inc.. (Wojcik, Matthew)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DECLARATION of Thomas C. Stratton re #1 Notice of Removal, by top shelf led inc.. (Wojcik, Matthew)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $402; Receipt #AWAEDC-4013718 Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K)(Wojcik, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phat N Sticky LLC v. Top Shelf Led Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: phat n sticky, llc
Represented By: Gabriel Saade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phat N Sticky LLC
Represented By: Gabriel S Saade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: top shelf led inc.
Represented By: Matthew R Wojcik
Represented By: Thomas C Stratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Top Shelf Led Inc
Represented By: Matthew R Wojcik
Represented By: Thomas C Stratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?