Sutter v. Global Equity Finance Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan A. Sutter and Jonathan A Sutter
Defendant: Global Equity Finance, Inc., Roy Koldaro and Global Equity Finance Inc
Case Number: 2:2022cv00105
Filed: May 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Mary K Dimke
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 11/1/2022 at 2:00 PM via Video Conference before Judge Mary K. Dimke. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(Ebel, David)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Notice of Intent to Move for Entry of Default by Jonathan A Sutter (Brandenberg, Michael)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING #4 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR REMAND TO STATE COURT AND FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Judge Mary K. Dimke. (AY, Case Administrator)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE by All Defendants re #1 Notice of Removal, #4 MOTION to Remand and for Attorney Fees and Costs - Notice of Related Case (Park, Cynthia)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by All Defendants Re #1 Notice of Removal, #4 MOTION to Remand and for Attorney Fees and Costs. Description: Amended Notice of Removal. (Park, Cynthia)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #4 MOTION to Remand and for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Jonathan A Sutter. (Chambers, Adam)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CORRECTED DOCUMENT filed by All Defendants Re #10 Response to Motion, #4 MOTION to Remand and for Attorney Fees and Costs. Description: typographical error. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Park, Cynthia)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DECLARATION by Cynthia S. Park in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand and for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by All Defendants. (Park, Cynthia)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand and for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Park, Cynthia)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Craig G. Russillo by Craig G Russillo on behalf of Global Equity Finance Inc (Russillo, Craig)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Global Equity Finance Inc. (Ebel, David)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by Christopher Holm Howard on behalf of Defendants Global Equity Finance Inc, Roy Koldaro (Howard, Christopher)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David R Ebel on behalf of Global Equity Finance Inc, Roy Koldaro (Attorney David R Ebel added to party Global Equity Finance Inc(pty:dft), Attorney David R Ebel added to party Roy Koldaro(pty:dft))(Ebel, David)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia S. Park on behalf of Global Equity Finance Inc, Roy Koldaro (Attorney Cynthia S. Park added to party Roy Koldaro(pty:dft))(Park, Cynthia)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Remand and for Attorney Fees and Costs by Jonathan A Sutter. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2022 Without Oral Argument before Judge Mary K. Dimke. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brandenberg, Michael)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jonathan A Sutter. (Brandenberg, Michael)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Mary K. Dimke assigned to case. (MRJ, Case Administrator)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DECLARATION of Christopher H. Howard in Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal to Federal Court re #1 Notice of Removal by Global Equity Finance, Inc., Roy Koldaro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Howard, Christopher)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $402; Receipt #AWAEDC-4030217 Filed by Roy Koldaro, Global Equity Finance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Howard, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sutter v. Global Equity Finance Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan A. Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan A Sutter
Represented By: Adam Joseph Chambers
Represented By: Michael J Brandenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Equity Finance, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Holm Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Koldaro
Represented By: Christopher Holm Howard
Represented By: Cynthia S. Park
Represented By: David R Ebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Equity Finance Inc
Represented By: Craig G Russillo
Represented By: Cynthia S. Park
Represented By: David R Ebel
Represented By: Christopher Holm Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?