Bigelow v. American Medical Systems Inc et al
Plaintiff: Cheryle Hoskins Bigelow
Defendant: American Medical Systems LLC, American Medical Systems Inc, American Medical Systems Holdings Inc, Astora Women's Health Inc, Astora Women's Health LLC, Astora Women's Health Holdings LLC, Astora Holdings LLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings Inc and Endo Health Solutions Inc
Case Number: 2:2022cv00134
Filed: May 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 JURY TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Pretrial Conference set for 10/26/2023 at 01:00 PM in Spokane Courtroom 755; Jury Trial set for 11/6/2023 at 09:00 AM in Spokane Courtroom 755. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (MRJ, Case Administrator)
July 14, 2022 Filing 21 Minute Entry for VIDEO CONFERENCE proceedings held before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian: Scheduling Conference held on 7/14/2022. (Reported/Recorded by: Not Reported) (PL, Courtroom Deputy)
July 7, 2022 Filing 20 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Talcott, Anne)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) Defendants' Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, ECF No. #18 , is GRANTED. Rachel B. Weil is hereby admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington in the above-captioned case. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(c), Defendants' local counsel of record, Anne M. Talcott and Kainui M. Smith, shall sign all pleadings, motions, and other papers prior to filing, and shall meaningfully participate in this case. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (MRJ, Case Administrator)
June 9, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Rachel B. Weil. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4052168. by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2022 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Talcott, Anne)
June 3, 2022 Filing 17 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Scheduling Conference set for 7/14/2022 at 11:45 AM by Video Conference before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
June 1, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by Jayme Mori on behalf of Defendants Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., American Medical Systems Holdings Inc, American Medical Systems Inc, American Medical Systems LLC, Astora Holdings LLC, Astora Women's Health Holdings LLC, Astora Women's Health Inc, Astora Women's Health LLC, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings Inc (Mori, Jayme)
June 1, 2022 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 3:22-cv-05157. Docket sheet received.
June 1, 2022 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (CV, Case Administrator)
May 31, 2022 Case sent to the Eastern District of Washington by electronic case transfer on 5/31/2022. (SB) [Transferred from Washington Western on 6/1/2022.]
May 16, 2022 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER re Plaintiff's #9 Notice of Related Cases. The Court hereby DIRECTS the Clerk to TRANSFER this case to the Honorable Stanley A. Bastian as related to case numbers C21-0306-SAB and C22-5037-SAB. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. Per LCR 3(i): Case will be transferred to the Eastern District of Washington by electronic case transfer on the 15th day following the date of this filing: 5/31/2022 (SR) [Transferred from Washington Western on 6/1/2022.]
May 16, 2022 Attorneys Jayme N Mori and Kainui M Smith added for Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, American Medical Systems Holdings Inc, American Medical Systems Inc, American Medical Systems LLC, Astora Holdings LLC, Astora Women's Health Holdings LLC, Astora Women's Health Inc, Astora Women's Health LLC, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings Inc; per #11 Answer to Amended Complaint. (SR) [Transferred from Washington Western on 6/1/2022.]
May 13, 2022 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Endo Health Solutions Inc. for Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc; Corporate Parent Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. for American Medical Systems Holdings Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, American Medical Systems Holdings Inc, Astora Holdings LLC, Astora Women's Health Holdings LLC, Astora Women's Health Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings Inc (Talcott, Anne) [Transferred from Washington Western on 6/1/2022.]
May 13, 2022 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Astora Women's Health LLC for American Medical Systems Inc; Corporate Parent Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. for Astora Women's Health LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by American Medical Systems Inc, American Medical Systems LLC, Astora Women's Health LLC (Talcott, Anne) [Transferred from Washington Western on 6/1/2022.]
May 13, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses with JURY DEMAND by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, American Medical Systems Holdings Inc, Astora Holdings LLC, Astora Women's Health Holdings LLC, Astora Women's Health Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings Inc.(Talcott, Anne) [Transferred from Washington Western on 6/1/2022.]
May 13, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #4 #1 Amended Complaint,, and Affirmative Defenses with JURY DEMAND Attorney Anne M Talcott added to party American Medical Systems Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Anne M Talcott added to party American Medical Systems LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Anne M Talcott added to party Astora Women's Health LLC(pty:dft) by American Medical Systems Inc, American Medical Systems LLC, Astora Women's Health LLC.(Talcott, Anne) Modified on 5/16/2022 to correct linkage (SR). [Transferred from Washington Western on 6/1/2022.]
April 28, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:21-cv-00306-SAB (EDWA), 4:22-cv-05037-SAB (EDWA), by Plaintiff Cheryle Hoskins Bigelow. (Cope, Breanne) [Transferred from Washington Western on 6/1/2022.]
April 20, 2022 Filing 8 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings Inc (Attachments: #1 Summons Endo Health Solutions Inc, #2 Summons Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc)(SR) [Transferred from Washington Western on 6/1/2022.]
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Breanne V Cope for Plaintiff Cheryle Hoskins Bigelow by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC) [Transferred from Washington Western on 6/1/2022.]
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT) [Transferred from Washington Western on 6/1/2022.]
March 17, 2022 Filing 5 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) American Medical Systems Holdings Inc, American Medical Systems Inc, American Medical Systems LLC, Astora Holdings LLC, Astora Women's Health Holdings LLC, Astora Women's Health Inc, Astora Women's Health LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(MJV) [Transferred from Washington Western on 6/1/2022.]
March 17, 2022 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc. with JURY DEMAND, filed by Cheryle Hoskins Bigelow. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Yackulic, Corrie) [Transferred from Washington Western on 6/1/2022.]
March 17, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Notice of Related Cases Omitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Notice of Related Case must be filed by 3/22/2022. (MJV) [Transferred from Washington Western on 6/1/2022.]
March 17, 2022 ***Civil Case 2:22-cv-00313 Terminated. Incorrect divisional office selected by filer. Please see C3:22-cv-05157 for all filings in this matter (MJV). [Transferred from Washington Western on 6/1/2022.]
March 17, 2022 NOTICE TO FILER: ***Case Terminated-Incorrect Division*** Civil case number 2:22-cv-00313 has been terminated. The incorrect divisional office was selected by the filer upon case opening. This case has now been assigned a Tacoma case number. All future filings shall bear the following case number: 3:22-cv-05157. Before initiating a new case, please review the #Attorney Case Opening Guide (PDF) to determine the correct divisional jurisdiction. (MJV) [Transferred from Washington Western on 6/1/2022.]
March 15, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Breanne V. Cope FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Cheryle Hoskins Bigelow (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7475225 (Yackulic, Corrie) [Transferred from Washington Western on 6/1/2022.]
March 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc., American Medical Systems, Inc., American Medical Systems, LLC individually and fka American Medical Systems, Inc., Astora Holdings, LLC, Astora Women's Health Holdings LLC, Astora Women's Health Inc, Astora Women's Health LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7475217) Attorney Corrie Johnson Yackulic added to party Cheryle Hoskins Bigelow(pty:pla), filed by Cheryle Hoskins Bigelow. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Yackulic, Corrie) [Transferred from Washington Western on 6/1/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bigelow v. American Medical Systems Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Systems LLC
Represented By: Anne M Talcott
Represented By: Jayme Mori
Represented By: Kainui M Smith
Represented By: Rachel B Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Systems Inc
Represented By: Anne M Talcott
Represented By: Jayme Mori
Represented By: Kainui M Smith
Represented By: Rachel B Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Systems Holdings Inc
Represented By: Anne M Talcott
Represented By: Jayme Mori
Represented By: Kainui M Smith
Represented By: Rachel B Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astora Women's Health Inc
Represented By: Anne M Talcott
Represented By: Jayme Mori
Represented By: Kainui M Smith
Represented By: Rachel B Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astora Women's Health LLC
Represented By: Anne M Talcott
Represented By: Jayme Mori
Represented By: Kainui M Smith
Represented By: Rachel B Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astora Women's Health Holdings LLC
Represented By: Anne M Talcott
Represented By: Jayme Mori
Represented By: Kainui M Smith
Represented By: Rachel B Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astora Holdings LLC
Represented By: Anne M Talcott
Represented By: Jayme Mori
Represented By: Kainui M Smith
Represented By: Rachel B Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Anne M Talcott
Represented By: Jayme Mori
Represented By: Kainui M Smith
Represented By: Rachel B Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings Inc
Represented By: Anne M Talcott
Represented By: Jayme Mori
Represented By: Kainui M Smith
Represented By: Rachel B Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Represented By: Anne M Talcott
Represented By: Jayme Mori
Represented By: Kainui M Smith
Represented By: Rachel B Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryle Hoskins Bigelow
Represented By: Breanne Vandermeer Cope
Represented By: Corrie Johnson Yackulic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?