National Center for Public Policy Research v. Schultz et al
Plaintiff: National Center for Public Policy Research
Defendant: Howard Schultz, Starbucks Corporation, Kevin Johnson, John Culver, Rachel Ruggeri, Ted Adams, Tyson Avery, Kelly Bengston, Brady Brewer, Dennis Brockman, George Dowdie, Jen Frisch, Shannon Garcia, Rachel Gonzalez, Zabrina Jenkins, A.J. Jones, II, Sara Kelly, Jennifer Kraft, Angela Lis, Carl Mount, Denise Nelsen, Anju Rao, Kyndra Russell, Debbie Stroud, Rossann Williams, Gina Woods, Mellody Hobson, Richard E Allison, Jr., Andrew Campion, Mary N Dillon, Isabel Ge Mahe, Jorgen Vig Knudstorp, Satya Nadella, Joshua Cooper Ramo, Clara Shih and Javier G Teruel
Case Number: 2:2022cv00267
Filed: November 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #9 MOTION to Change Venue to Western District of Washington filed by Ted Adams, Richard E Allison, Jr., Tyson Avery, Kelly Bengston, Brady Brewer, Dennis Brockman, John Culver, Mary N Dillon, George Dowdie, Jen Frisch, Shannon Garcia, Rachel Gonzalez, Mellody Hobson, Zabrina Jenkins, Kevin Johnson, A.J. Jones, II, Sara Kelly, Jennifer Kraft, Angela Lis, Carl Mount, Satya Nadella, Denise Nelsen, Joshua Cooper Ramo, Anju Rao, Rachel Ruggeri, Kyndra Russell, Howard Schultz, Clara Shih, Starbucks Corporation, Debbie Stroud, Javier G Teruel, Rossann Williams, Gina Woods. (Watts, Gregory)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Change Venue to Western District of Washington filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ard, Joel)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Daniel Morenoff on behalf of Plaintiff, ECF No. #13 , is GRANTED. Daniel Morenoff is hereby admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington in the above-captioned case. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(c), Plaintiffs local counsel of record, Joel B. Ard, shall sign all pleadings, motions, and other papers prior to filing, and shall meaningfully participate in this case. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (TNC, Case Administrator)
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Daniel Morenoff. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4160037. by National Center for Public Policy Research. Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2022 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Ard, Joel)
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National Center for Public Policy Research. (Ard, Joel)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DECLARATION by Angela Webster-Lam in Support re #9 MOTION to Change Venue to Western District of Washington filed by Ted Adams, Richard E Allison, Jr., Tyson Avery, Kelly Bengston, Brady Brewer, Dennis Brockman, John Culver, Mary N Dillon, George Dowdie, Jen Frisch, Shannon Garcia, Rachel Gonzalez, Mellody Hobson, Zabrina Jenkins, Kevin Johnson, A.J. Jones, II, Sara Kelly, Jennifer Kraft, Angela Lis, Carl Mount, Satya Nadella, Denise Nelsen, Joshua Cooper Ramo, Anju Rao, Rachel Ruggeri, Kyndra Russell, Howard Schultz, Clara Shih, Starbucks Corporation, Debbie Stroud, Javier G Teruel, Rossann Williams, Gina Woods. (Watts, Gregory)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DECLARATION by Mary Zou in Support re #9 MOTION to Change Venue to Western District of Washington filed by Ted Adams, Richard E Allison, Jr., Tyson Avery, Kelly Bengston, Brady Brewer, Dennis Brockman, John Culver, Mary N Dillon, George Dowdie, Jen Frisch, Shannon Garcia, Rachel Gonzalez, Mellody Hobson, Zabrina Jenkins, Kevin Johnson, A.J. Jones, II, Sara Kelly, Jennifer Kraft, Angela Lis, Carl Mount, Satya Nadella, Denise Nelsen, Joshua Cooper Ramo, Anju Rao, Rachel Ruggeri, Kyndra Russell, Howard Schultz, Clara Shih, Starbucks Corporation, Debbie Stroud, Javier G Teruel, Rossann Williams, Gina Woods. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A pg 4-9)(Watts, Gregory)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Change Venue to Western District of Washington by Ted Adams, Richard E Allison, Jr., Tyson Avery, Kelly Bengston, Brady Brewer, Dennis Brockman, John Culver, Mary N Dillon, George Dowdie, Jen Frisch, Shannon Garcia, Rachel Gonzalez, Mellody Hobson, Zabrina Jenkins, Kevin Johnson, A.J. Jones, II, Sara Kelly, Jennifer Kraft, Angela Lis, Carl Mount, Satya Nadella, Denise Nelsen, Joshua Cooper Ramo, Anju Rao, Rachel Ruggeri, Kyndra Russell, Howard Schultz, Clara Shih, Starbucks Corporation, Debbie Stroud, Javier G Teruel, Rossann Williams, Gina Woods. Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2022 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Watts, Gregory)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #4 MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE; #5 EXPEDITE. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (TNC, Case Administrator)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alexander C Ekstrom no longer assigned to case. TEXT ORDER ONLY. NO PDF ATTACHED. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (RG, Chief Deputy)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Clerks Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent Form. Please Note: Declination of Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Parties wishing to decline consent of this assignment must complete and return the attached Declination of Consent Form to the Clerk of Court by the Case Management Deadline set for 11/17/2022. (TNC, Case Administrator)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Defendants Motion to Extend Deadline by Ted Adams, Richard E Allison, Jr., Tyson Avery, Kelly Bengston, Brady Brewer, Dennis Brockman, John Culver, Mary N Dillon, George Dowdie, Jen Frisch, Shannon Garcia, Rachel Gonzalez, Mellody Hobson, Zabrina Jenkins, Kevin Johnson, A.J. Jones, II, Sara Kelly, Jennifer Kraft, Angela Lis, Carl Mount, Satya Nadella, Denise Nelsen, Joshua Cooper Ramo, Anju Rao, Rachel Ruggeri, Kyndra Russell, Howard Schultz, Clara Shih, Starbucks Corporation, Debbie Stroud, Javier G Teruel, Rossann Williams, Gina Woods. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2022 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Watts, Gregory)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, 1-2 Operative Complaint by Ted Adams, Richard E Allison, Jr., Tyson Avery, Kelly Bengston, Brady Brewer, Dennis Brockman, John Culver, Mary N Dillon, George Dowdie, Jen Frisch, Shannon Garcia, Rachel Gonzalez, Mellody Hobson, Zabrina Jenkins, Kevin Johnson, A.J. Jones, II, Sara Kelly, Jennifer Kraft, Angela Lis, Carl Mount, Satya Nadella, Denise Nelsen, Joshua Cooper Ramo, Anju Rao, Rachel Ruggeri, Kyndra Russell, Howard Schultz, Clara Shih, Starbucks Corporation, Debbie Stroud, Javier G Teruel, Rossann Williams, Gina Woods. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2022 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Watts, Gregory)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Starbucks Corporation. (Watts, Gregory)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DECLARATION of Stephanie L. Jensen re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Ted Adams, Richard E Allison, Jr., Tyson Avery, Kelly Bengston, Brady Brewer, Dennis Brockman, John Culver, Mary N Dillon, George Dowdie, Jen Frisch, Shannon Garcia, Rachel Gonzalez, Mellody Hobson, Zabrina Jenkins, Kevin Johnson, A.J. Jones, II, Sara Kelly, Jennifer Kraft, Angela Lis, Carl Mount, Satya Nadella, Denise Nelsen, Joshua Cooper Ramo, Anju Rao, Rachel Ruggeri, Kyndra Russell, Howard Schultz, Clara Shih, Starbucks Corporation, Debbie Stroud, Javier G Teruel, Rossann Williams, Gina Woods. (Watts, Gregory)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $402; Receipt #AWAEDC-4155981 Filed by Sara Kelly, A.J. Jones, II, Jennifer Kraft, Starbucks Corporation, Rossann Williams, Mary N Dillon, Rachel Gonzalez, Tyson Avery, Javier G Teruel, Debbie Stroud, Denise Nelsen, Angela Lis, Zabrina Jenkins, Gina Woods, Kelly Bengston, Brady Brewer, Kevin Johnson, Clara Shih, Satya Nadella, Kyndra Russell, Mellody Hobson, Carl Mount, Anju Rao, Ted Adams, Joshua Cooper Ramo, Dennis Brockman, Howard Schultz, Shannon Garcia, Richard E Allison, Jr., Jen Frisch, John Culver, George Dowdie, Rachel Ruggeri. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit A pg 11-12, #2 Exhibit B pg 13-39 Operative Complaint)(Watts, Gregory)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Judge Assignment. Magistrate Judge Alexander C Ekstrom assigned to case. (TNC, Case Administrator)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Remark: Case will be reassigned to Article III Judge. Disregard #6 Clerks Notice. (RG, Chief Deputy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Center for Public Policy Research v. Schultz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Center for Public Policy Research
Represented By: Joel Bernard Ard
Represented By: Daniel Morenoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Schultz
Represented By: Gregory L Watts
Represented By: Mary Zou
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Gregory L Watts
Represented By: Mary Zou
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Johnson
Represented By: Gregory L Watts
Represented By: Mary Zou
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Culver
Represented By: Gregory L Watts
Represented By: Mary Zou
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Ruggeri
Represented By: Gregory L Watts
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Jensen
Represented By: Mary Zou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Adams
Represented By: Mary Zou
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Jensen
Represented By: Gregory L Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Avery
Represented By: Gregory L Watts
Represented By: Mary Zou
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Bengston
Represented By: Gregory L Watts
Represented By: Mary Zou
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brady Brewer
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Jensen
Represented By: Gregory L Watts
Represented By: Mary Zou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Brockman
Represented By: Gregory L Watts
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Jensen
Represented By: Mary Zou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Dowdie
Represented By: Gregory L Watts
Represented By: Mary Zou
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jen Frisch
Represented By: Mary Zou
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Jensen
Represented By: Gregory L Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Garcia
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Jensen
Represented By: Gregory L Watts
Represented By: Mary Zou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Gonzalez
Represented By: Mary Zou
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Jensen
Represented By: Gregory L Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zabrina Jenkins
Represented By: Gregory L Watts
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Jensen
Represented By: Mary Zou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.J. Jones, II
Represented By: Gregory L Watts
Represented By: Mary Zou
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Kelly
Represented By: Gregory L Watts
Represented By: Mary Zou
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Kraft
Represented By: Gregory L Watts
Represented By: Mary Zou
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Lis
Represented By: Gregory L Watts
Represented By: Mary Zou
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Mount
Represented By: Gregory L Watts
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Jensen
Represented By: Mary Zou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Nelsen
Represented By: Mary Zou
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Jensen
Represented By: Gregory L Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anju Rao
Represented By: Gregory L Watts
Represented By: Mary Zou
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyndra Russell
Represented By: Gregory L Watts
Represented By: Mary Zou
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Stroud
Represented By: Gregory L Watts
Represented By: Mary Zou
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rossann Williams
Represented By: Gregory L Watts
Represented By: Mary Zou
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Woods
Represented By: Gregory L Watts
Represented By: Mary Zou
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mellody Hobson
Represented By: Gregory L Watts
Represented By: Mary Zou
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard E Allison, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory L Watts
Represented By: Mary Zou
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Campion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary N Dillon
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Jensen
Represented By: Gregory L Watts
Represented By: Mary Zou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isabel Ge Mahe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorgen Vig Knudstorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Satya Nadella
Represented By: Gregory L Watts
Represented By: Mary Zou
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Cooper Ramo
Represented By: Gregory L Watts
Represented By: Mary Zou
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clara Shih
Represented By: Gregory L Watts
Represented By: Mary Zou
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javier G Teruel
Represented By: Gregory L Watts
Represented By: Mary Zou
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?