George et al v. Best et al
Plaintiff: Reginald Albert George, Jr, Andrea D George, Morgan George, AG and VG
Defendant: Dustin Best, Edward Striedinger, Steve Brown, William Bob, David Butz, David LaBounty, Mackenzie Shaffer, Kristopher Brakebill, Alan O'Neal, Henry Hix, Theodore Nelson and United States of America
Intervenor Defendant: Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation
Case Number: 2:2022cv00285
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Alexander C Ekstrom
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss & Petition for Certification by Dustin Best, William Bob, Kristopher Brakebill, Steve Brown, David Butz, Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation, Henry Hix, David LaBounty, Theodore Nelson, Alan O'Neal, Mackenzie Shaffer, Edward Striedinger. Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2023 Without Oral Argument before Magistrate Judge Alexander C Ekstrom. (Kerley, Christopher)
January 18, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (atty Craig Jacobson, Geoffrey Strommer, Craig Nichols) by Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation. Motion Hearing set for 2/17/2023 Without Oral Argument before Magistrate Judge Alexander C Ekstrom. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Craig Jacobson in Support of Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel, #2 Proposed Order)(Jacobson, Craig)
January 17, 2023 Filing 11 Clerks Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent Form. Please Note: Declination of Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Parties wishing to decline consent of this assignment must complete and return the attached Declination of Consent Form to the Clerk of Court by the Case Management Deadline set for 1/27/2023 (REM, Case Administrator)
January 13, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Joseph Kerley on behalf of Dustin Best, William Bob, Kristopher Brakebill, Steve Brown, David Butz, Henry Hix, David LaBounty, Theodore Nelson, Alan O'Neal, Mackenzie Shaffer, Edward Striedinger (Attorney Christopher Joseph Kerley added to party Dustin Best(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Joseph Kerley added to party William Bob(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Joseph Kerley added to party Kristopher Brakebill(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Joseph Kerley added to party Steve Brown(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Joseph Kerley added to party David Butz(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Joseph Kerley added to party Henry Hix(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Joseph Kerley added to party David LaBounty(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Joseph Kerley added to party Theodore Nelson(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Joseph Kerley added to party Alan O'Neal(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Joseph Kerley added to party Mackenzie Shaffer(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Joseph Kerley added to party Edward Striedinger(pty:dft))(Kerley, Christopher)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #7 MOTION TO INTERVENE. CTC's request for a stay of discovery is denied. The CTC shall have the motion to dismiss, ECF No. 8-2, separately noted and filed before the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alexander C Ekstrom. (LAS, Case Administrator)
December 12, 2022 Filing 8 AMENDED/CORRECTED DOCUMENT MOTION to Amend/Correct #7 Motion to Intervene, and accompanying filings, by Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation. Motion Hearing set for 2/1/2023 Without Oral Argument before Magistrate Judge Alexander C Ekstrom. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Limited Appearance, #2 Motion to Dismiss, #3 Proposed Order re Motion to Intervene and Stay Discovery)(Jacobson, Craig) Modified on 12/12/2022 to modify event to Amended/Corrected Document and terminate motion filed error (CLP, Case Administrator Team Lead).
December 9, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Intervene by Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation. Motion Hearing set for 2/1/2023 Without Oral Argument before Magistrate Judge Alexander C Ekstrom. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Limited Appearance, #2 Motion to Dismiss, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jacobson, Craig) SEE AMENDED/CORRECTED DOCUMENT AT ECF NO #8 Modified on 12/12/2022 to add link (CLP, Case Administrator Team Lead).
November 22, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Alan O'Neal. (REM, Case Administrator)
November 22, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Steve Brown, #2 Summons Dustin Best, #3 Summons William Bob, #4 Summons Kristopher Brakebill, #5 Summons David Butz, #6 Summons Henry Hix, #7 Summons David LaBounty, #8 Summons Theodore Nelson, #9 Summons Mackenzie Shaffer, #10 Summons Edward Striedinger) (REM, Case Administrator)
November 22, 2022 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent Form. Please Note: Declination of Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Parties wishing to decline consent of this assignment must complete and return the attached Declination of Consent Form to the Clerk of Court by the Case Management Deadline set for 12/2/2022. (REM, Case Administrator)
November 21, 2022 Filing 2 REDACTED COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing Fee $402, Receipt # AWAEDC-4166227) Jury Demand. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exh A, #3 Exh B, #4 Exh C, #5 Exh D, #6 Exh E, #7 Exh F, #8 Exh G, #9 Exh H, #10 Exh I, #11 Exh J, #12 Exh K, #13 Summons USA, #14 Summons Brown, #15 Summons Best, #16 Summons Bob, #17 Summons Brakebill, #18 Summons Butz, #19 Summons Hix, #20 Summons LaBounty, #21 Summons Nelson, #22 Summons Shaffer, #23 Summons Striedinger)(REM, Case Administrator)
November 21, 2022 Notice of Judge Assignment. Magistrate Judge Alexander C Ekstrom assigned to case. (REM, Case Administrator)
November 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402; Receipt # AWAEDC-4166227) Jury Demand. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons)(George, Andrea) Modified on 11/21/2022 to seal document due to minor names (CLP, Case Administrator Team Lead). SEE REDACTED COMPLAINT, EXHIBITS, CIVIL COVER SHEET AND PROPOSED SUMMONS AT ECF NO #2 Modified on 11/22/2022 (CLP, Case Administrator Team Lead).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George et al v. Best et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Albert George, Jr
Represented By: Andrea Dawn George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea D George
Represented By: Andrea Dawn George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan George
Represented By: Andrea Dawn George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AG
Represented By: Andrea Dawn George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VG
Represented By: Andrea Dawn George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Best
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Kerley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Striedinger
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Kerley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Brown
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Kerley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Bob
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Kerley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Butz
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Kerley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David LaBounty
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Kerley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mackenzie Shaffer
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Kerley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristopher Brakebill
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Kerley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan O'Neal
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Kerley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Hix
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Kerley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore Nelson
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Kerley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation
Represented By: Craig A Jacobson
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Kerley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?