Hand v. Biomarin Pharmaceuticals Inc
Plaintiff: Don J Hand
Defendant: Biomarin Pharmaceuticals Inc
Case Number: 2:2022cv00286
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jennifer M Vasquez added for Plaintiff Don J. Hand. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER - NO PDF ATTACHED. (BF, Paralegal)
November 22, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Biomarin Pharmaceuticals Inc. (TNC, Case Administrator)
November 21, 2022 Filing 3 CORRECTED DOCUMENT filed by Don J Hand Re #1 Complaint. Description: Font turned foreign in summons. (Serrano, Simon)
November 21, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Jennifer M. Vasquez. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4166733. by Don J Hand. Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2022 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Serrano, Simon)
November 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402; Receipt # AWAEDC-4166723) Jury Demand. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Serrano, Simon) Modified on 11/22/2022 summons resent at ECF #3 (TNC, Case Administrator).
November 21, 2022 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (TNC, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hand v. Biomarin Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don J Hand
Represented By: Simon Peter Serrano
Represented By: Jennifer M Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomarin Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?