Tinfra LLC v. BIT Capital Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tinfra LLC
Defendant: BIT Capital Group LLC, Jimmy Odom and James Thommes
Case Number: 2:2023cv00082
Filed: March 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Mary K Dimke
Referring Judge: Alexander C Ekstrom
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ON NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i); denying as moot #17 MOTION to Dismiss. All claims are DISMISSED without prejudice, without an award of fees or costs. This file is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Mary K. Dimke. (LTR, Case Administrator)
May 10, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Tinfra LLC (Thoreson, Brad)
May 8, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Mary K. Dimke. (O'Connell, Thomas)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #15 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE INITIAL RESPONSIVE PLEADING AND DENYING #10 MOTION REQUESTING THAT NO TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER BE ENTERED WITHOUT GIVING DEFENDANTS NOTICE AND AN OPPORTUNITY TO BE HEARD BE ENTERED. Signed by Judge Mary K. Dimke. (LTR, Case Administrator)
April 12, 2023 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 5/12/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Mary K. Dimke. (O'Connell, Thomas)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Ben McIntosh is hereby admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington in the above-captioned case on behalf of the Defendants. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(c), Defendants' local counsel of record shall sign all pleadings, motions, and other papers prior to filing, and shall meaningfully participate in this case. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the order of the Court. Signed by Judge Mary K. Dimke. (CV, Courtroom Deputy)
March 31, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Ben McIntosh. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4261287. by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Mary K. Dimke. (O'Connell, Thomas)
March 30, 2023 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE by Tinfra LLC re James Thommes. (Thoreson, Brad)
March 30, 2023 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE by Tinfra LLC re BIT Capital Group LLC. (Thoreson, Brad)
March 30, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Protective Order by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Mary K. Dimke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Emails re Refrain from Ex Parte TRO)(O'Connell, Thomas)
March 30, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Limited Admission by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Mary K. Dimke. (O'Connell, Thomas) Modified on 3/31/2023 See Amended Motion filed at ECF No. #13 . (LAS, Case Administrator).
March 30, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Francis O'Connell on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Thomas Francis O'Connell added to party BIT Capital Group LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Francis O'Connell added to party Jimmy Odom(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Francis O'Connell added to party James Thommes(pty:dft))(O'Connell, Thomas)
March 27, 2023 Filing 7 Clerk's ORDER OF RANDOM REASSIGNMENT. Judge Mary K. Dimke assigned to case. TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF DOCUMENT WILL ISSUE. This text-only entry constitutes the order or notice by the Court. (LTR, Case Administrator)
March 24, 2023 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tinfra LLC. (Thoreson, Brad)
March 24, 2023 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tinfra LLC. (Thoreson, Brad)
March 24, 2023 Filing 4 Pursuant to Civil Rule 7.1(a)(2), Parties or Intervenors in a 28 U.S.C. 1332(a) diversity case must file a DIVERSITY Disclosure Statement using the event Disclosure Statement - Diversity Cases Only. TEXT ENTRY - No PDF Document. (LTR, Case Administrator)
March 24, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BIT Capital Group LLC, Jimmy Odom, James Thommes. (Attachments: #1 Summons Jimmy Odom, #2 Summons James Thommes)(LTR, Case Administrator)
March 24, 2023 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent Form. Please Note: Declination of Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Parties wishing to decline consent of this assignment must complete and return the attached Declination of Consent Form to the Clerk of Court by the Case Management Deadline set for 4/3/2023. (LTR, Case Administrator)
March 24, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BIT Capital, Jimmy Odom, James Thommes ( Filing fee $ 402; Receipt # AWAEDC-4255747) Filed by Tinfra, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Summons BIT Capital, #5 Summons Jimmy Odom, #6 Summons James Thommes, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thoreson, Brad)
March 24, 2023 Notice of Judge Assignment. Magistrate Judge Alexander C Ekstrom assigned to case. (LTR, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tinfra LLC v. BIT Capital Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tinfra LLC
Represented By: Brad P Thoreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIT Capital Group LLC
Represented By: Benjamin McIntosh
Represented By: Thomas Francis O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Odom
Represented By: Benjamin McIntosh
Represented By: Thomas Francis O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Thommes
Represented By: Benjamin McIntosh
Represented By: Thomas Francis O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?