Bales et al v. Sanofi US Services Inc et al
Plaintiff: Donna M. Bales, Collin L. Bales, Donna M Bales and Collin L Bales
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc., sanofi-aventis US LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc. and Sanofi US Services Inc
Case Number: 2:2023cv00158
Filed: May 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by Hunter K Ahern on behalf of Defendants Sanofi US Services Inc, Sanofi-Aventis US LLC (Ahern, Hunter) Modified on 6/21/2023 Incorrect attorney login used. Local counsel Hunter K Ahern filed notice on behalf of attorneys Byard, DePaz, and Kaufman. Attorney Hunter K Ahern not withdrawing. (BM, Case Administrator).
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) Plaintiffs' Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Re: Appearing on Behalf Plaintiffs, ECF No. #20 , is GRANTED. Jessica A. Reynolds is hereby admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington in the above-captioned case. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(c), Local counsel of record, Corrie J. Yackulic, shall sign all pleadings, motions, and other papers prior to filing, and shall meaningfully participate in this case. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (BM, Case Administrator)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) Defendants' Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Harley V. Ratliff, ECF No. #18 , is GRANTED. Harley V. Ratliff is hereby admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington in the above-captioned case. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(c), Local counsel of record, Hunter K. Ahern, shall sign all pleadings, motions, and other papers prior to filing, and shall meaningfully participate in this case. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (BM, Case Administrator)
June 8, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Jessica A. Reynolds. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4309415. by Collin L Bales, Donna M Bales. Motion Hearing set for 7/10/2023 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Yackulic, Corrie)
June 8, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Corrie Johnson Yackulic on behalf of Collin L Bales, Donna M Bales (Attorney Corrie Johnson Yackulic added to party Collin L Bales(pty:pla), Attorney Corrie Johnson Yackulic added to party Donna M Bales(pty:pla))(Yackulic, Corrie)
June 7, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Harley V. Ratliff. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4308575. by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 7/7/2023 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ahern, Hunter)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) Defendants' Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Connor J. Sears, ECF No. #14 , is GRANTED. Connor J. Sears is hereby admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington in the above-captioned case. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(c), Local counsel of record, Hunter K. Ahern, shall sign all pleadings, motions, and other papers prior to filing, and shall meaningfully participate in this case. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (BM, Case Administrator)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) Defendants' Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Jordan Baehr, ECF No. #13 , is GRANTED. Jordan Baehr is hereby admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington in the above-captioned case. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(c), Local counsel of record, Hunter K. Ahern, shall sign all pleadings, motions, and other papers prior to filing, and shall meaningfully participate in this case. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (BM, Case Administrator)
June 2, 2023 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by All Defendants. (Ahern, Hunter)
June 2, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Connor J. Sears. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4305344. by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 7/3/2023 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ahern, Hunter)
June 2, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Jordan Baehr. Filing fee $200, receipt number AWAEDC-4305284 by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 7/3/2023 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ahern, Hunter)
June 2, 2023 Filing 12 Pursuant to Civil Rule 7.1(a)(2), Parties or Intervenors in a 28 U.S.C. 1332(a) diversity case must file a DIVERSITY Disclosure Statement using the event Disclosure Statement - Diversity Cases Only. TEXT ENTRY - No PDF Document. (BM, Case Administrator)
June 2, 2023 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by All Defendants. (Ahern, Hunter)
June 2, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Hunter K Ahern on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Hunter K Ahern added to party Sanofi US Services Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Hunter K Ahern added to party sanofi-aventis US LLC(pty:dft))(Ahern, Hunter)
May 26, 2023 Filing 9 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Eastern District of Louisiana; Case Number 2:18-cv-03855. Original file, transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TRANSFER ORDER - Case transferred to Eastern District of Washington. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 5/12/2023. (MDL 2740, Doc. 15836)(sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/26/2023.]
May 22, 2023 Filing 7 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2)(Kaufman, Christopher) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/26/2023.]
May 22, 2023 Filing 6 Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (General) (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4, #5 5, #6 6, #7 7, #8 8, #9 9, #10 10, #11 11, #12 12, #13 13, #14 14, #15 15, #16 16, #17 17, #18 18, #19 19, #20 20, #21 21, #22 22, #23 23, #24 24, #25 25, #26 26, #27 27, #28 28, #29 29, #30 30, #31 31, #32 32, #33 33, #34 34, #35 35, #36 36, #37 37, #38 38, #39 39, #40 40, #41 41, #42 42, #43 43, #44 44, #45 45, #46 46, #47 47, #48 48, #49 49, #50 50, #51 51, #52 52, #53 53, #54 54, #55 55, #56 56, #57 57, #58 58, #59 59, #60 60, #61 61, #62 62, #63 63, #64 64, #65 65, #66 66, #67 67, #68 68, #69 69, #70 70, #71 71, #72 72, #73 73, #74 74, #75 75, #76 76, #77 77, #78 78, #79 79, #80 80, #81 81, #82 82, #83 83, #84 84, #85 85, #86 86, #87 87, #88 88, #89 89, #90 90, #91 91, #92 92, #93 93, #94 94, #95 95, #96 96, #97 97, #98 98, #99 99, #100 100, #101 101, #102 102, #103 103, #104 104, #105 105, #106 106, #107 107, #108 108, #109 109, #110 110, #111 111, #112 112, #113 113, #114 114, #115 115, #116 116)(Winsberg, Gabriel) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/26/2023.]
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/26/2023.]
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/26/2023.]
April 12, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/26/2023.]
April 12, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/26/2023.]
April 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-6795385) filed by Donna M. Bales, Collin L. Bales. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)Attorney Christopher L. Coffin added to party Collin L. Bales(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher L. Coffin added to party Donna M. Bales(pty:pla).(Coffin, Christopher) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/26/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bales et al v. Sanofi US Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Harley Victor Ratliff
Represented By: Adrienne L Byard
Represented By: Christopher J Kaufman
Represented By: Connor Sears
Represented By: Matt DePaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: sanofi-aventis US LLC
Represented By: Harley Victor Ratliff
Represented By: Adrienne L Byard
Represented By: Christopher J Kaufman
Represented By: Connor Sears
Represented By: Matt DePaz
Represented By: Hunter K Ahern
Represented By: Jordan Carmichael Baehr
Represented By: Connor Jay Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Harley Victor Ratliff
Represented By: Adrienne L Byard
Represented By: Christopher J Kaufman
Represented By: Connor Sears
Represented By: Matt DePaz
Represented By: Connor Jay Sears
Represented By: Hunter K Ahern
Represented By: Jordan Carmichael Baehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc
Represented By: Matt DePaz
Represented By: Harley Victor Ratliff
Represented By: Hunter K Ahern
Represented By: Christopher J Kaufman
Represented By: Connor Jay Sears
Represented By: Jordan Carmichael Baehr
Represented By: Adrienne L Byard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna M. Bales
Represented By: Christopher L. Coffin
Represented By: Jessica Ann Reynolds
Represented By: Nicholas Ryan Rockforte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Collin L. Bales
Represented By: Christopher L. Coffin
Represented By: Jessica Ann Reynolds
Represented By: Nicholas Ryan Rockforte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna M Bales
Represented By: Jessica Ann Reynolds
Represented By: Nicholas Ryan Rockforte
Represented By: Corrie Johnson Yackulic
Represented By: Christopher L Coffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Collin L Bales
Represented By: Jessica Ann Reynolds
Represented By: Christopher L Coffin
Represented By: Corrie Johnson Yackulic
Represented By: Nicholas Ryan Rockforte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?