Wall Street Apartments LLC et al v. City of Spokane et al
Plaintiff: Wall Street Apartments LLC and Alaa Elkharwily
Defendant: City of Spokane, Luis Garcia, Dermott Murphy, Lance Dahl, Brian Schaeffer, Nathan Mulkey and Jason Ruffing
Case Number: 2:2023cv00262
Filed: September 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Richard T Wylie added for Alaa Elkharwily and Wall Street Apartments LLC. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal)
October 2, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(Odle, Nathaniel)
September 29, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynden Patrick Smithson on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Lynden Patrick Smithson added to party City of Spokane(pty:dft), Attorney Lynden Patrick Smithson added to party Lance Dahl(pty:dft), Attorney Lynden Patrick Smithson added to party Luis Garcia(pty:dft), Attorney Lynden Patrick Smithson added to party Nathan Mulkey(pty:dft), Attorney Lynden Patrick Smithson added to party Dermott Murphy(pty:dft), Attorney Lynden Patrick Smithson added to party Jason Ruffing(pty:dft), Attorney Lynden Patrick Smithson added to party Brian Schaeffer(pty:dft))(Smithson, Lynden)
September 29, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel J Odle on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Nathaniel J Odle added to party City of Spokane(pty:dft), Attorney Nathaniel J Odle added to party Lance Dahl(pty:dft), Attorney Nathaniel J Odle added to party Luis Garcia(pty:dft), Attorney Nathaniel J Odle added to party Nathan Mulkey(pty:dft), Attorney Nathaniel J Odle added to party Dermott Murphy(pty:dft), Attorney Nathaniel J Odle added to party Jason Ruffing(pty:dft), Attorney Nathaniel J Odle added to party Brian Schaeffer(pty:dft))(Odle, Nathaniel)
September 22, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Richard T. Wylie. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4380548. by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Humphries, Neil)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Denying Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
September 12, 2023 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Alaa Elkharwily. (BM, Case Administrator)
September 11, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Alaa Elkharwily. Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of TRO, #2 Declaration in Support of TRO, #3 Proposed Order)(LTR, Case Administrator)
September 11, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing Fee $402, Receipt # 41824) Filed by Alaa Elkharwily. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Appendix 1 to Complaint)(LTR, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wall Street Apartments LLC et al v. City of Spokane et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wall Street Apartments LLC
Represented By: Richard T Wylie
Represented By: Neil Edward Humphries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaa Elkharwily
Represented By: Neil Edward Humphries
Represented By: Richard T Wylie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Spokane
Represented By: Nathaniel J Odle
Represented By: Lynden Patrick Smithson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Garcia
Represented By: Nathaniel J Odle
Represented By: Lynden Patrick Smithson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dermott Murphy
Represented By: Nathaniel J Odle
Represented By: Lynden Patrick Smithson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Dahl
Represented By: Nathaniel J Odle
Represented By: Lynden Patrick Smithson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Schaeffer
Represented By: Nathaniel J Odle
Represented By: Lynden Patrick Smithson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Mulkey
Represented By: Lynden Patrick Smithson
Represented By: Nathaniel J Odle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Ruffing
Represented By: Nathaniel J Odle
Represented By: Lynden Patrick Smithson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?