Mann v. Sanofi-Aventis US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Darline Lea Mann
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc, Sanofi-Aventis US LLC and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv00320
Filed: November 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Christopher J Kaufman added for Sanofi US Services Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis US LLC. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF ATTACHED. (BF, Paralegal)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney John Thomas Kirtley, III added for Darline Lea Mann. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF ATTACHED. (BF, Paralegal)
November 30, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: John Thomas Kirtley III. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4430051. by Darline Lea Mann. Motion Hearing set for 1/2/2024 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Diamond, Maria)
November 30, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria S Diamond on behalf of Darline Lea Mann (Attorney Maria S Diamond added to party Darline Lea Mann(pty:pla))(Diamond, Maria)
November 29, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Settlement Pending and Request to Stay by All Defendants (Rich, Steven)
November 21, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Christoher J. Kaufman. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4426065. by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rich, Steven)
November 21, 2023 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by All Defendants. (Rich, Steven)
November 21, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Wayne Rich on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Steven Wayne Rich added to party Sanofi US Services Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Wayne Rich added to party Sanofi-Aventis US LLC(pty:dft))(Rich, Steven)
November 7, 2023 Filing 7 Case TRANSFERRED in from Eastern District of Louisiana; Case Number 2:18-cv-12709. Original file and docket sheet received.
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TRANSFER ORDER- Case transferred to Eastern District of Washington. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, Doc. 16511) (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
September 26, 2023 Filing 5 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. JOINT DESIGNATION OF GENERAL AND CASE-SPECIFIC MDL RECORDS TO BE INCLUDED UPON REMAND (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Ratliff, Harley) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (as) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7285475) filed by Darline Lea Mann. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC)Attorney Russell T. Abney added to party Darline Lea Mann(pty:pla).(Abney, Russell) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mann v. Sanofi-Aventis US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc
Represented By: Christopher J Kaufman
Represented By: Steven Wayne Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis US LLC
Represented By: Christopher J Kaufman
Represented By: Steven Wayne Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J Kaufman
Represented By: Steven Wayne Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darline Lea Mann
Represented By: Hunter Vance Linville
Represented By: John Thomas Kirtley, III
Represented By: Russell Todd Abney
Represented By: Maria S Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?