Bourg et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Charles Bourg and Deborah Lynn Brinson
Defendant: Cerner State & Local Government Services, United States of America, Cerner Corporation, Cerner Government Services, Inc., Cerner Health Connections, Inc., Cerner Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Cerner Innovation, Inc., Cerner International, Inc., Cerner Lingologix, Inc., Cerner Multum, Inc., Cerner Properties, Inc., Cerner Property Development, Inc., Oracle Corporation, Cerner Government Services Inc, Cerner Health Connections Inc, Cerner Healthcare Solutions Inc, Cerner Innovation Inc, Cerner International Inc, Cerner Lingologix Inc, Cerner Multum Inc, Cerner Properties Inc and Cerner Property Development Inc
Case Number: 2:2023cv00348
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Dean W. Baxtresser. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4470287. by Cerner Corporation, Cerner Innovation Inc, Cerner International Inc, Cerner Properties Inc, Cerner Property Development Inc. Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2024 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Power, Vanessa)
January 25, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Robin M. Hulshizer. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4470284. by Cerner Corporation, Cerner Innovation Inc, Cerner International Inc, Cerner Properties Inc, Cerner Property Development Inc. Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2024 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Power, Vanessa)
January 25, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Mary Rose Alexander. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4470261. by Cerner Corporation, Cerner Innovation Inc, Cerner International Inc, Cerner Properties Inc, Cerner Property Development Inc. Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2024 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Power, Vanessa)
January 16, 2024 Filing 17 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cerner Corporation, Cerner Health Connections Inc, Cerner Healthcare Solutions Inc, Cerner Innovation Inc, Cerner International Inc, Cerner Lingologix Inc, Cerner Multum Inc, Cerner Properties Inc, Cerner Property Development Inc, Cerner State & Local Government Services. (Power, Vanessa)
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE; Granting Defendants Cerner Entities' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Serve a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants Cerner Entities shall file a responsive pleading to the #1 Complaint on or before March 8, 2024. Case Management Deadline set for 3/8/2024. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (BM, Case Administrator)
January 8, 2024 Filing 15 DECLARATION by Robin M. Hulshizer in Support re #14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, filed by Cerner Corporation, Cerner Health Connections Inc, Cerner Healthcare Solutions Inc, Cerner Innovation Inc, Cerner International Inc, Cerner Lingologix Inc, Cerner Multum Inc, Cerner Properties Inc, Cerner Property Development Inc, Cerner State & Local Government Services, Oracle Corporation. (Power, Vanessa)
January 8, 2024 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Cerner Corporation, Cerner Health Connections Inc, Cerner Healthcare Solutions Inc, Cerner Innovation Inc, Cerner International Inc, Cerner Lingologix Inc, Cerner Multum Inc, Cerner Properties Inc, Cerner Property Development Inc, Cerner State & Local Government Services, Oracle Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2024 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 proposed Order)(Power, Vanessa)
January 8, 2024 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re Cerner Property Development Inc. (Gellatly, Robert)
January 8, 2024 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re Cerner Properties Inc. (Gellatly, Robert)
January 8, 2024 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re Cerner Multum Inc. (Gellatly, Robert)
January 8, 2024 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re Cerner Lingologix Inc. (Gellatly, Robert)
January 8, 2024 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re Cerner International Inc. (Gellatly, Robert)
January 8, 2024 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re Cerner Innovation Inc. (Gellatly, Robert)
January 8, 2024 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re Cerner Healthcare Solutions Inc. (Gellatly, Robert)
January 8, 2024 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re Cerner Health Connections Inc. (Gellatly, Robert)
January 8, 2024 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re Cerner State & Local Government Services. (Gellatly, Robert)
January 8, 2024 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re Cerner Corporation. (Gellatly, Robert)
January 5, 2024 Filing 3 PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re United States of America. (Gellatly, Robert)
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Cerner Corporation, Cerner Health Connections, Inc., Cerner Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Cerner Innovation, Inc., Cerner International, Inc., Cerner Lingologix, Inc., Cerner Multum, Inc., Cerner Properties, Inc., Cerner Property Development, Inc., Cerner State & Local Government Services, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons Cerner Corp, #2 Summons Health Connections, #3 Summons Cerner Healthcare Solutions, #4 Summons Cerner Innovation, #5 Summons Cerner International, #6 Summons Cerner LingoLogix, #7 Summons Cerner Local and State Gov Services, #8 Summons Cerner Multum, #9 Summons Cerner Properties, #10 Summons Cerner Property Development)(BM, Case Administrator)
December 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405; Receipt # AWAEDC-4431144) Jury Demand. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gellatly, Robert)
December 1, 2023 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (BM, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bourg et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cerner State & Local Government Services
Represented By: Vanessa Soriano Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cerner Corporation
Represented By: Vanessa Soriano Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cerner Government Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cerner Health Connections, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cerner Healthcare Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cerner Innovation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cerner International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cerner Lingologix, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cerner Multum, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cerner Properties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cerner Property Development, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oracle Corporation
Represented By: Vanessa Soriano Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cerner Government Services Inc
Represented By: Vanessa Soriano Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cerner Health Connections Inc
Represented By: Vanessa Soriano Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cerner Healthcare Solutions Inc
Represented By: Vanessa Soriano Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cerner Innovation Inc
Represented By: Vanessa Soriano Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cerner International Inc
Represented By: Vanessa Soriano Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cerner Lingologix Inc
Represented By: Vanessa Soriano Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cerner Multum Inc
Represented By: Vanessa Soriano Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cerner Properties Inc
Represented By: Vanessa Soriano Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cerner Property Development Inc
Represented By: Vanessa Soriano Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Bourg
Represented By: George M Ahrend
Represented By: J. Andrew Hoyal, II
Represented By: Mark Douglas Kamitomo
Represented By: Robert Neil Gellatly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Lynn Brinson
Represented By: George M Ahrend
Represented By: J. Andrew Hoyal, II
Represented By: Mark Douglas Kamitomo
Represented By: Robert Neil Gellatly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?