Eurofins Microbiology Laboratories Inc v. Anatek Labs Inc et al
Plaintiff: Eurofins Microbiology Labratories Inc
Defendant: Anatek Labs Inc and Kyle Johnson
Case Number: 2:2024cv00004
Filed: January 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by Dale A De Felice on behalf of Defendant Anatek Labs Inc (De Felice, Dale)
February 8, 2024 Filing 20 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Scheduling Conference set for 3/18/2024 at 11:00 AM by Video Conference before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, ECF No. #14 , is GRANTED. Joseph R. Welsh is hereby admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington in the above-captioned case. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(c), Plaintiff's local counsel of record, Jessica E. La Londe, shall sign all pleadings, motions, and other papers prior to filing, and shall meaningfully participate in this case. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A. Bastian. (WMK, Case Administrator)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, ECF No. #13 , is GRANTED. Shannon Hampton Sutherland is hereby admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington in the above-captioned case. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(c), Plaintiff's local counsel of record, Jessica E. La Londe, shall sign all pleadings, motions, and other papers prior to filing, and shall meaningfully participate in this case. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A. Bastian. (WMK, Case Administrator)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, ECF No. #12 , is GRANTED. Lawrence H. Pockers is hereby admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington in the above-captioned case. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(c), Plaintiff's local counsel of record, Jessica E. La Londe, shall sign all pleadings, motions, and other papers prior to filing, and shall meaningfully participate in this case. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A. Bastian. (WMK, Case Administrator)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) Defendants' Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, ECF No. #11 , is GRANTED. Alexandra Grande is hereby admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington in the above-captioned case. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(c), Defendants' local counsel of record, Dale A. De Felice and Paul S. Stewart, shall sign all pleadings, motions, and other papers prior to filing, and shall meaningfully participate in this case. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A. Bastian.(WMK, Case Administrator)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) Defendants' Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, ECF No. #10 , is GRANTED. A. Dean Bennett is hereby admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington in the above-captioned case. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(c), Defendants' local counsel of record, Dale A. De Felice and Paul S. Stewart, shall sign all pleadings, motions, and other papers prior to filing, and shall meaningfully participate in this case. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A. Bastian. (WMK, Case Administrator)
February 6, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Joseph R. Welsh. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4478408. by Eurofins Microbiology Labratories Inc. Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2024 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice as to Joseph R. Welsh)(La Londe, Jessica)
February 6, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Shannon Hampton Sutherland. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4478403. by Eurofins Microbiology Labratories Inc. Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2024 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice as to Shannon Hampton Sutherland)(La Londe, Jessica)
February 6, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Lawrence H. Pockers. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4478390. by Eurofins Microbiology Labratories Inc. Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2024 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice as to Lawrence H. Pockers)(La Londe, Jessica)
February 5, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Alexandra Grande. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4477846. by Anatek Labs Inc. Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2024 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (De Felice, Dale)
February 5, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: A. Dean Bennett. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4477836. by Anatek Labs Inc. Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2024 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (De Felice, Dale)
February 5, 2024 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Anatek Labs Inc. (De Felice, Dale)
February 5, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Sykes Stewart on behalf of Anatek Labs Inc (Attorney Paul Sykes Stewart added to party Anatek Labs Inc(pty:dft))(Stewart, Paul)
February 5, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Dale A De Felice on behalf of Anatek Labs Inc (Attorney Dale A De Felice added to party Anatek Labs Inc(pty:dft))(De Felice, Dale)
January 25, 2024 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eurofins Microbiology Labratories Inc re Anatek Labs Inc. (La Londe, Jessica)
January 22, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence Ronald Cock on behalf of Kyle Johnson (Attorney Lawrence Ronald Cock added to party Kyle Johnson(pty:dft))(Cock, Lawrence)
January 19, 2024 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eurofins Microbiology Labratories Inc re Kyle Johnson. (La Londe, Jessica)
January 8, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Kyle Johnson) (WMK, Case Administrator)
January 8, 2024 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Eurofins Microbiology Laboratories, Inc.. (La Londe, Jessica) Modified on 1/8/2024 to correct event title. (WMK, Case Administrator)
January 8, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anatek Labs, Inc., Kyle Johnson ( Filing fee $ 405; Receipt # AWAEDC-4455833) Jury Demand. Filed by Eurofins Microbiology Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Anatek Labs, Inc., #4 Summons Kyle Johnson)(La Londe, Jessica)
January 8, 2024 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (WMK, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eurofins Microbiology Laboratories Inc v. Anatek Labs Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eurofins Microbiology Labratories Inc
Represented By: Jessica E La Londe
Represented By: Joseph R Welsh
Represented By: Lawrence H Pockers
Represented By: Shannon Hampton Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anatek Labs Inc
Represented By: Anthony Dean Bennett
Represented By: Alexandra Shantel Grande
Represented By: Paul Sykes Stewart
Represented By: Dale A De Felice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Johnson
Represented By: Lawrence Ronald Cock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?