First Interstate Bank v. Wall Street Apartments, LLC
Plaintiff: First Interstate Bank
Defendant: Wall Street Apartments, LLC
Interested Party: Alaa Elkharwily
Case Number: 2:2024cv00115
Filed: April 5, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2024 Filing 21 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #19 MOTION to Stay by Alaa Elkharwily. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit to motion to stay)(Humphries, Neil)
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying #15 Motion to Stay; granting #16 Motion to Expedite; denying #19 Motion to Stay: Alaa Elkharwily's substantive motions are denied. Mr. Elkharwily is not a lawyer and cannot represent a corporation. The Court Ordered this case to be Remanded to State Court. A Notice of Appeal was filed, divesting the Court of jurisdiction. This case is CLOSED in this Court. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ORDER ONLY - NO PDF ATTACHED
April 29, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION to Stay by Alaa Elkharwily. Motion Hearing set for 5/29/2024 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Supplement injunction relief, #2 Supplement proposed order)(Humphries, Neil)
April 29, 2024 Filing 18 9CCA Appeal Time Schedule and Case Number: 24-2694 for #13 Notice of Appeal filed by Wall Street Apartments, LLC. Mediation Questionnaire Due: 5/6/2024. Opening Brief Due: 6/10/2024. Appellees Brief Due: 7/9/2024. (WMK, Case Administrator)
April 26, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Joinder by Alaa Elkharwily re #15 MOTION to Stay, #16 MOTION to Expedite. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (WMK, Case Administrator)
April 26, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION to Expedite re: Motion to Stay and for Injunctive Relief by Alaa Elkharwily. Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2024 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (WMK, Case Administrator)
April 26, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay District Court Order Pending Appeal and for Injunctive Relief; and Declaration in Support, re #11 Order of Remand, by Alaa Elkharwily. Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2024 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Cover Letter) (WMK, Case Administrator)
April 24, 2024 Filing 14 Letter from Appeal Deputy Clerk to Neil Edward Humphries dated 4/24/2024. (Attachments: #1 Public Docket Sheet)(WMK, Case Administrator)
April 24, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEAL from District Court decision as to #11 Order of Remand, by Wall Street Apartments, LLC. Appeal Fee $605; Status PAID, receipt number 42487. (WMK, Case Administrator) Modified on 4/29/2024: 9CCA #24-2694. (WMK, Case Administrator)
April 24, 2024 Filing 12 LODGED NOTICE OF APPEAL by All Defendants. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number 42487. (Humphries, Neil) Modified on 4/24/2024 to add receipt number. (WMK, Case Administrator)
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT; granting ECF Nos #4 and #5 , Defendant's Motion to Remand and Motion to Expedite. Case remanded to Spokane County Superior Court. File CLOSED. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (WMK, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
April 15, 2024 Filing 10 Joinder and OBJECTIONS (to two and all notices to compensate the receiver and his attorneys and professionals) by Alaa Elkharwily, MD, Interested Party. (WMK, Case Administrator)
April 15, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Alaa Elkharwily, MD, Interested Party by Alaa Elkharwily. (WMK, Case Administrator)
April 15, 2024 Filing 8 OBJECTIONS by Wall Street Apartments, LLC. (Humphries, Neil)
April 10, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Neil Edward Humphries on behalf of Wall Street Apartments, LLC (Humphries, Neil)
April 10, 2024 Filing 6 DECLARATION by Barry W. Davidson in Support re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Wall Street Apartments, LLC. (Goforth, Aaron)
April 10, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by Wall Street Apartments, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2024 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Goforth, Aaron)
April 10, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION to Expedite Wall Street Apartments, LLC's Motion for Remand by Wall Street Apartments, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2024 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goforth, Aaron)
April 10, 2024 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wall Street Apartments, LLC. (Goforth, Aaron)
April 10, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron D Goforth on behalf of Wall Street Apartments, LLC (Attorney Aaron D Goforth added to party Wall Street Apartments, LLC(pty:dft))(Goforth, Aaron)
April 5, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $405; Receipt #AWAEDC-4520836 Filed by Wall Street Apartments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover sheet)(Wylie, Richard)
April 5, 2024 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (WMK, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Interstate Bank v. Wall Street Apartments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Interstate Bank
Represented By: James B Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wall Street Apartments, LLC
Represented By: Neil Edward Humphries
Represented By: Aaron D Goforth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Alaa Elkharwily
Represented By: Neil Edward Humphries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?