Moore v. Andrewjeski
Petitioner: Charles Allen Moore, Jr
Respondent: Melissa Andrewjeski
Case Number: 2:2024cv00162
Filed: May 15, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING #3 #4 MOTIONS AND ORDER TO AMEND PETITION; Plaintiff may file within 60 days of the date of this Order an amended petition. Petitioner's failure to amend as directed will be construed as his consent to the dismissal of this action. Amended Petition/Dismissal Deadline set for 8/16/2024. Signed by Senior Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 First Amended 2254 Form)(LTR, Case Administrator) **29 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Charles Moore, Prisoner ID: 428534)
May 30, 2024 Filing Fee Received. Receipt #42583 in the amount of $5.00 from Coyote Ridge obo Charles Moore. (LTR, Case Administrator) **PRINT NEF ONLY** (Charles Moore, Prisoner ID: 428534)
May 20, 2024 Filing 6 Motion: to SUPPLEMENT Additional Evidence to Support Ground for Relief Pursuant to RAP 16.4(C)(1)(2) and 28 U.S.C. 2254(a)(d)(1) - RAP 10.10 re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Charles Allen Moore, Jr. (LTR, Case Administrator) **260 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Charles Moore, Prisoner ID: 428534)
May 15, 2024 Filing 5 Letter from Clerk - Advising prisoner of case number and deficiency. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (LTR, Case Administrator) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Charles Moore, Prisoner ID: 428534)
May 15, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION: Designation of Records, Appointment of Counsel, Evidentiary Hearing Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a); 28 U.S.C. 2254(a)(d)(1); RAP 16.4(c)(1)(2) by Charles Allen Moore, Jr. Motion Hearing set for 6/14/2024 Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (LTR, Case Administrator) **4 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Charles Moore, Prisoner ID: 428534)
May 15, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION: Stay and Abey Pending Discovery Material/Exhaustion of State Remedies - Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254(b)(1) by Charles Allen Moore, Jr. Motion Hearing set for 6/14/2024 Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (LTR, Case Administrator) **8 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Charles Moore, Prisoner ID: 428534)
May 15, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5 Receipt #IFP Pending.) Filed by Charles Allen Moore, Jr.(LTR, Case Administrator) **43 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Charles Moore, Prisoner ID: 428534) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/16/2024 to flatten filed stamp) (LTR, Case Administrator).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Andrewjeski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles Allen Moore, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Melissa Andrewjeski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?