Contreras v. City of Kennewick

Plaintiff: Jose Antonio Contreras
Defendant: City of Kennewick
Case Number: 4:2018cv05150
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: Washington Eastern District Court
0 Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
1 Judge: Edward F Shea
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2018 12 NOTICE of Change of Address. Notification received by prison/jail. New address: Airway Heights Corrections Center, P.O. Box 2049, Ariway Heights, WA 99001-2049. (VR, Courtroom Deputy) **TEXT ONLY ENTRY, PRINT NEF ONLY** (Jose Contreras, Prisoner ID: 319551)
November 6, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO AMEND OR FILE A MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Plaintiff may file within 60 days of the date of this order an amended complaint or attached motion to voluntarily dismiss complaint or risk dismissal and a 'strike' under 28 USC 1915(g). Amended Complaint/Voluntary Dismissal Deadline set for 1/7/2019. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form)(PL, Case Administrator) **23 PAGES, PRINT ALL** (Jose Contreras, Prisoner ID: 319551)
November 6, 2018 10 COMPLAINT against City of Kennewick (Receipt # IFP). Filed by Jose Antonio Contreras.(PL, Case Administrator) **10 PAGES, PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jose Contreras, Prisoner ID: 319551)
November 6, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER Granting Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Directing Institution to Calculate, Collect, and Forward Payment; application by plaintiff to proceed IFP is granted; DCE directed to file complaint; an initial partial filing fee will be calculated and collected by Department of Corrections (agency having custody of plaintiff). cc of Order and Acknowledgment/Authorization sent to agency. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (PL, Case Administrator) **2 PAGES, PRINT ALL** (Jose Contreras, Prisoner ID: 319551)
November 2, 2018 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jose Antonio Contreras. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Envelope)(PL, Case Administrator) **2 PAGES, PRINT NEF ONLY** (Jose Contreras, Prisoner ID: 319551)
October 17, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. For reasons that are unnecessary to recite here, it has been determined that this case should be reassigned to Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson for all further proceedings. The parties are directed to change the initials on the case number from EFS to RMP on all future pleadings to reflect this reassignment. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE.(BF, Paralegal) **TEXT ONLY ENTRY, PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jose Contreras, Prisoner ID: 319551)
September 13, 2018 6 Notice of Receipt of Signature Page Re ECF No. #1 Received Complaint filed in response to deficiency letter ECF No. #5 . (TR, Case Administrator) **13 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Jose Contreras, Prisoner ID: 319551)
September 11, 2018 5 Letter from Clerk - Advising prisoner of case number and deficiency. (Attachments: #1 Complaint with Signature page) (TR, Case Administrator) **PRINT ALL** (Jose Contreras, Prisoner ID: 319551)
September 11, 2018 1 RECEIVED COMPLAINT - Receipt # none (IFP) Filed by Jose Antonio Contreras. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TR, Case Administrator) **10 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jose Contreras, Prisoner ID: 319551) Modified on 9/11/2018: Received via USPS (TR, Case Administrator).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Contreras v. City of Kennewick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Kennewick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Antonio Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?