American Fidelity Assurance Company v. Salter et al

Plaintiff: American Fidelity Assurance Company
Defendant: Does 1-10, Douglas Huber, Duane Huber, Kathryn Salter and Susan Shrode
Case Number: 4:2018cv05152
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: Washington Eastern District Court
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2018 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Douglas Huber, Duane Huber, Susan Shrode.(Attorney Brant L Stevens added to party Douglas Huber(pty:dft), Attorney Brant L Stevens added to party Duane Huber(pty:dft), Attorney Brant L Stevens added to party Susan Shrode(pty:dft))(Stevens, Brant)
October 17, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Fidelity Assurance Company re Kathryn Salter. (Engel, Robert)
October 12, 2018 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Katheryn Salter, Defendant, First CROSSCLAIM against Does 1-10, Douglas Huber, Duane Huber, Susan Shrode by Kathryn Salter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Attorney Bryce Rodney Myrvang added to party Kathryn Salter(pty:dft))(Myrvang, Bryce)
September 11, 2018 3 Summons Issued to Kathryn Salter (Attachments: #1 Summons Susan Shrode, #2 Summons Douglas Huber, #3 Summons Duane Huber)(AY, Case Administrator)
September 11, 2018 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator)
September 11, 2018 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Fidelity Assurance Company. (Engel, Robert)
September 11, 2018 1 COMPLAINT for Interpleader and Declaratory Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-2983158) Filed by American Fidelity Assurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 11, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons to Kathryn Salter, #4 Summons to Douglas Huber, #5 Summons to Susan Shrode, #6 Summons to Duane Huber)(Engel, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2018: #8 Exhibits. Modified on 9/11/2018 to add exhibits with personal identifiers redacted. (AY, Case Administrator). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2018: #9 Complaint) (AY, Case Administrator).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Fidelity Assurance Company v. Salter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Huber
Represented By: Brant L Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane Huber
Represented By: Brant L Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn Salter
Represented By: Bryce Rodney Myrvang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Shrode
Represented By: Brant L Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Fidelity Assurance Company
Represented By: Robert G Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?