Lewis v. Penrose et al

Plaintiff: Justin Edward Lewis
Defendant: Delmar Bice and Gina Penrose
Case Number: 4:2018cv05153
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: Washington Eastern District Court
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2018 4 NOTICE of Constitutional Challenge Re #1 Notice of Removal, by Justin Edward Lewis. Follow Up on 12/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(VR, Courtroom Deputy) **73 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Justin Lewis, Prisoner ID: 807814)
October 15, 2018 3 NOTICE SETTING DEADLINE FOR JOINT STATUS CERTIFICATE AND PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN: The parties shall hold a Rule 26(d)(1) conference and file a Joint Status Certificate and Proposed Discovery Plan by 11/16/2018. The Court will then issue a Scheduling Order. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Justin Lewis, Prisoner ID: 807814)
September 19, 2018 2 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. by Delmar Bice, Gina Penrose.(Dittman, John) **PRINT ALL** (Justin Lewis, Prisoner ID: 807814)
September 12, 2018 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (TR, Case Administrator) **TEXT ONLY ENTRY, PRINT NEF ONLY** (Justin Lewis, Prisoner ID: 807814)
September 12, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $400; Receipt #0980-2984107 Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum, #2 Exhibit Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dittman, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Penrose et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Edward Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delmar Bice
Represented By: John C Dittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Penrose
Represented By: John C Dittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?