Smith v. Bechtel National Inc et al
Plaintiff: Donald Smith
Defendant: Bechtel National Inc and Mission Support Alliance LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv05159
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Compliance With Scheduling Order by Mission Support Alliance LLC (Adamson, Cheryl)
November 20, 2018 Filing 9 Joint Certificate Pursuant to Rule 26 / Rule 16 by all parties by Donald Smith. (Edelblute, William)
October 15, 2018 Filing 8 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/20/2018 at 09:10 AM before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge form)(DB, Courtroom Deputy)
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Mission Support Alliance LLC.(Adamson, Cheryl)
October 4, 2018 Filing 6 Defendant Bechtel National, Inc.s ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Bechtel National Inc.(Baumgardner, Kevin)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mission Support Alliance LLC. (Adamson, Cheryl)
September 27, 2018 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr assigned to case. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bechtel National, Inc.. (Baumgardner, Kevin)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 DECLARATION of J. Robert Humphries in Support of Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Baumgardner, Kevin)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Kevin C. Baumgardner in Support of Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Baumgardner, Kevin)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $400; Receipt #0980-2996807 Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baumgardner, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Bechtel National Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bechtel National Inc
Represented By: Kevin C Baumgardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mission Support Alliance LLC
Represented By: Cheryl Rani Guttenberg Adamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Smith
Represented By: William Edelblute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?