Durbin v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Zachery Durbin
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 4:2018cv05165
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Washington Eastern District Court
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2018 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Michael Durkin on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Attorney Timothy Michael Durkin added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft))(Durkin, Timothy)
December 7, 2018 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zachery Durbin re Commissioner of Social Security. (Hatfield, Chad)
December 6, 2018 8 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Summons Joe Harrington, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(PL, Case Administrator)
December 6, 2018 7 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (Receipt # SPO033641) Filed by Zachery Durbin.(PL, Case Administrator)
December 6, 2018 Payment Received: Receipt #SPO033641 in the amount of $50.00 from Hatfield Law PLLC re Partial Filing Fee Ordered at ECF No. #6 . (LR, Case Administrator)
December 6, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND SETTING A PARTIAL FEE. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall pay a filing fee of $50.00 to initiate this action, which sum shall also satisfy any administrative fee. Case Management Deadline set for 1/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (PL, Case Administrator)
November 6, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH LEAVE TO RENEW. Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals Plaintiff failed to accurately provide the total household income and the total household expenses. Accordingly, the court is unable to permit the filing of the Complaint without prepayment of the filing fee. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall proffer the full filing fee, show cause why prepayment would be inappropriate, or submit a properly completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Case Management Deadline set for 12/6/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
October 12, 2018 2 Featured Case ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH LEAVE TO RENEW. Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals lack of information. Accordingly, the court is unable to permit the filing of the Complaint without prepayment of the filing fee. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall proffer the full filing fee, show cause why prepayment would be inappropriate, or submit a properly completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Case Management Deadline set for 11/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (TR, Case Administrator)
October 12, 2018 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (TR, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Durbin v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Timothy Michael Durkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachery Durbin
Represented By: Chad L Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?