Ludlum v. C&I Engineering LLC
Plaintiff: Audrey Ludlum
Defendant: C&I Engineering LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv05192
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 10 First AMENDED COMPLAINT Class and Collective Action against C&I Engineering LLC. Jury Demand. Filed by Audrey Ludlum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kovarik, Nicholas)
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Audrey Ludlum re C&I Engineering LLC. (Josephson, Michael)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Michael A Josephson added for Audrey Ludlum. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL FOLLOW. (BF, Paralegal)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Andrew W Dunlap added for Audrey Ludlum. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL FOLLOW. (BF, Paralegal)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Richard M Schreiber added for Audrey Ludlum. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL FOLLOW. (BF, Paralegal)
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Michael A. Josephson. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3053494. by Audrey Ludlum. Motion Hearing set for 1/14/2019 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Kovarik, Nicholas)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Andrew W. Dunlap. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3053490. by Audrey Ludlum. Motion Hearing set for 1/14/2019 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Kovarik, Nicholas)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Richard M. Schreiber. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3053472. by Audrey Ludlum. Motion Hearing set for 1/14/2019 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Kovarik, Nicholas)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to C&I Engineering LLC. (AY, Case Administrator)
December 14, 2018 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class and Collective Action against C&I Engineering, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3053406) Jury Demand. Filed by Audrey Ludlum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Kovarik, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ludlum v. C&I Engineering LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&I Engineering LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Ludlum
Represented By: Nicholas D Kovarik
Represented By: Andrew W Dunlap
Represented By: Michael A Josephson
Represented By: Richard M Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?