Priser v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jennifer Priser
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 4:2019cv05020
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Edward F Shea
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daphne Banay on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Attorney Daphne Banay added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft))(Banay, Daphne)
March 12, 2019 Filing fee: $150, receipt number SPO034310. (AY, Case Administrator)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Michael Durkin on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Attorney Timothy Michael Durkin added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft))(Durkin, Timothy)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Priser re Commissioner of Social Security. (Hatfield, Chad)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND SETTING A PARTIAL FILING FEE. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall pay a filing fee of $150.00 to initiate this action, which sum shall also satisfy any administrative fee. Filing Fee due by 3/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (LR, Case Administrator)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney, #2 Summons Issued as to Attorney General)(LR, Case Administrator)
February 7, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Senior Judge Edward F. Shea assigned to case. (LR, Case Administrator)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security IFP Pending Filed by Jennifer Priser. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Hatfield, Chad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Priser v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Daphne Banay
Represented By: Timothy Michael Durkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Priser
Represented By: Chad L Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?