United States of America v. Mission Support Alliance LLC et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Mission Support Alliance LLC, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Jorge Francisco Armijo and Lockheed Martin Services Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv05021
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3731
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF shall issue) GRANTING, for good cause shown, the parties' Joint Motion to Modify Timing and Page Limits under Local [Civil] Rule 7, ECF No. #29 , and Motion to Expedite, ECF No. #28 , hearing of the same. The total page limit for the anticipated motions to dismiss from Defendants shall be extended by 10 pages per motion. Defendants may apportion pages among their memoranda so long as the memoranda do not collectively exceed 90 pages. The total page limit for the United States' response memoranda shall be extended by 10 pages per motion. The United States may apportion pages among its memoranda so long as the memoranda do not collectively exceed 90 pages. The United States shall file its response memoranda by June 24, 2019. Defendants shall file their reply memoranda by July 29, 2019. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on these matters. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting ECF Nos. #22 , #24 , #26 , Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Eric Nitz, Justin Shur, and Lucas Walker, having applied for pro hac vice status and being found to meet the requirements for pro hac vice membership, are hereby added as counsel for Defendant Jorge Francisco Armijo. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
March 29, 2019 Filing 29 Joint MOTION Modify Timing re #28 Joint MOTION to Expedite Joint Motion to Modify Timing and Page Limits by Lockheed Martin Corporation, Lockheed Martin Services Inc. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Malkin, Harold)
March 29, 2019 Filing 28 Joint MOTION to Expedite Joint Motion to Modify Timing and Page Limits by Lockheed Martin Corporation, Lockheed Martin Services Inc. Motion Hearing set for 4/5/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Malkin, Harold)
March 29, 2019 Filing 27 DECLARATION by Lucas Walker in Support re #26 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Lucas Walker. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3128420. filed by Jorge Francisco Armijo. (Van Dessel, Geana)
March 29, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Lucas Walker. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3128420. by Jorge Francisco Armijo. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Dessel, Geana)
March 29, 2019 Filing 25 DECLARATION by Justin Shur in Support re #24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Justin Shur. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3128418. filed by Jorge Francisco Armijo. (Van Dessel, Geana)
March 29, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Justin Shur. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3128418. by Jorge Francisco Armijo. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Dessel, Geana)
March 29, 2019 Filing 23 DECLARATION by Eric Nitz in Support re #22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Eric Nitz. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3128411. filed by Jorge Francisco Armijo. (Van Dessel, Geana)
March 29, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Eric Nitz. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3128411. by Jorge Francisco Armijo. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Dessel, Geana)
March 26, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Geana Van Dessel on behalf of Jorge Francisco Armijo (Attorney Geana Van Dessel added to party Jorge Francisco Armijo(pty:dft))(Van Dessel, Geana)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting ECF Nos. #17 , #18 , Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Andrew S. Tulumello and Alex Gesch, having applied for pro hac vice status and being found to meet the requirements for pro hac vice membership, are hereby added as counsel for Defendant Mission Support Alliance, LLC. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
March 25, 2019 Filing 19 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lockheed Martin Corporation, Lockheed Martin Services Inc. (Duffy, Barbara)
March 22, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Alex Gesch. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3122932. by Mission Support Alliance LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Bavand, Marisa)
March 22, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Andrew S. Tulumello. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3122923. by Mission Support Alliance LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Bavand, Marisa)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting ECF Nos. #9 , #10 , #11 , #12 , #13 , Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Michael J. Bronson, Michael J. Ferrara, Maryann P. Surrick, Patrick M. Hagan, and Laurie A Witek, having applied for pro hac vice status and being found to meet the requirements for pro hac vice membership, are hereby added as counsel for Defendants Lockheed Martin Services, Inc. and Lockheed Martin Corporation. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
March 20, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance of Allison L. Murphy by Allison L Murphy on behalf of Mission Support Alliance LLC (Attorney Allison L Murphy added to party Mission Support Alliance LLC(pty:dft))(Murphy, Allison)
March 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance of Marisa M. Bavand by Marisa M Bavand on behalf of Mission Support Alliance LLC (Attorney Marisa M Bavand added to party Mission Support Alliance LLC(pty:dft))(Bavand, Marisa)
March 20, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Laurie A. Witek. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3120778. by Lockheed Martin Corporation, Lockheed Martin Services Inc. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Malkin, Harold)
March 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Patrick M. Hagan. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3120773. by Lockheed Martin Corporation, Lockheed Martin Services Inc. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Malkin, Harold)
March 20, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Maryann P. Surrick. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3120767. by Lockheed Martin Corporation, Lockheed Martin Services Inc. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Malkin, Harold)
March 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Michael J. Ferrara. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3120759. by Lockheed Martin Corporation, Lockheed Martin Services Inc. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Malkin, Harold)
March 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Michael J. Bronson. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3120744. by Lockheed Martin Corporation, Lockheed Martin Services Inc. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Malkin, Harold)
March 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara J Duffy on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corporation, Lockheed Martin Services Inc (Attorney Barbara J Duffy added to party Lockheed Martin Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Barbara J Duffy added to party Lockheed Martin Services Inc(pty:dft))(Duffy, Barbara)
March 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Malkin on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corporation, Lockheed Martin Services Inc (Attorney Harold Malkin added to party Lockheed Martin Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Harold Malkin added to party Lockheed Martin Services Inc(pty:dft))(Malkin, Harold)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America re Lockheed Martin Services Inc. (Fruchter, Daniel)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America re Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Fruchter, Daniel)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America re Mission Support Alliance LLC. (Fruchter, Daniel)
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America re United States of America. (Fruchter, Daniel)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Errata filed by United States of America: Re #1 Complaint, to add county of Defendant on Civil Cover Page. (Tornabene, Tyler)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jorge F Armijo, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Lockheed Martin Services, Inc., Mission Support Alliance, LLC Fee Waived Jury Demand. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fruchter, Daniel)
February 8, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Mission Support Alliance LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mission Support Alliance LLC
Represented By: Marisa M Bavand
Represented By: Andrew S Tulumello
Represented By: Allison L Murphy
Represented By: Alex C Gesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Represented By: Maryann P Surrick
Represented By: Patrick M Hagan
Represented By: Harold Malkin
Represented By: Michael J Bronson
Represented By: Laurie A Witek
Represented By: Michael J Ferrara
Represented By: Barbara J Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Francisco Armijo
Represented By: Geana Van Dessel
Represented By: Justin V Shur
Represented By: Eric R Nitz
Represented By: Lucas M Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Services Inc
Represented By: Maryann P Surrick
Represented By: Patrick M Hagan
Represented By: Harold Malkin
Represented By: Michael J Bronson
Represented By: Laurie A Witek
Represented By: Michael J Ferrara
Represented By: Barbara J Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Sara McLean
Represented By: Joseph H Hunt
Represented By: Alexandra N Wilson
Represented By: Michael D Granston
Represented By: Don Williamson
Represented By: Daniel Hugo Fruchter
Represented By: Tyler Howard Louis Tornabene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?