Heck v. Key et al

Plaintiff: Clinton Heck
Defendant: Janet Nelson, James Funnemark and James Key
Case Number: 4:2019cv05033
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE RE: NON-COMPLIANCE WITH E-FILING PROGRAM. The Eastern District of Washington received documents from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to General Order 16-35-1, participation in the E-Filing Program is mandatory for all prisoner litigants incarcerated at facilities participating in the Prison E-Filing Program. Please comply by submitting all future documents to be filed with this Court to the law librarian/designee for electronic filing. (CLP, Case Administrator) **TEXT ONLY ENTRY, PRINT NEF ONLY** (Clinton Heck, Prisoner ID: 807946)
April 5, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from Clerk, U.S. District Court to Clinton Heck dated 4/5/2019. (CLP, Case Administrator) **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Clinton Heck, Prisoner ID: 807946)
April 5, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Clinton Heck to Clerk, U.S. District Court dated 4/2/2019 sent via U.S. Postal Service. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CLP, Case Administrator) **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Clinton Heck, Prisoner ID: 807946)
March 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address Received via USPS by Clinton Heck. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TR, Case Administrator) **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Clinton Heck, Prisoner ID: 807946)
March 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address. Notification received by prison/jail. New address: Airway Heights Corrections Center, PO Box 2049, Airway Heights, WA 99001-2049. (TR, Case Administrator) **TEXT ONLY ENTRY, PRINT NEF ONLY** (Clinton Heck, Prisoner ID: 807946)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Plaintiff shall not serve the summons issued by the Clerk's Office, ECF No. #5 , until the Court has conducted the 28 U.S.C. 1915A screening of Plaintiff's Complaint. This is a text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court order on the matter. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. (TR, Case Administrator) **TEXT ONLY ENTRY, PRINT NEF ONLY**(Clinton Heck, Prisoner ID: 807946)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Clerk - Advising prisoner of case number and deficiency. (CV, Case Administrator) **PRINT ALL** (Clinton Heck, Prisoner ID: 807946)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (CV, Case Administrator)**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Clinton Heck, Prisoner ID: 807946)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James Funnemark, James Key, Janet Nelson (Receipt # IFP Pending) Jury Demand. Filed by Clinton Heck. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(CV, Case Administrator) **20 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Clinton Heck, Prisoner ID: 807946)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heck v. Key et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton Heck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Funnemark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Key
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?